This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/07/2020 at 13:07:59 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS GAYLE, STEPHEN WAYNE

Case Summary

On 01/16/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GAYLE, STEPHEN WAYNE. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KRAUSE, DEBRA L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********246A

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KRAUSE, DEBRA L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

GAYLE, STEPHEN WAYNE

Orlando, FL 32810

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

FETTER, BRYCE A

450 N Wymore Rd

Winter Park, FL 32789

 

Court Documents

NOLLE PROSEQUI - DATE: 03/02/2020

03/02/2020: NOLLE PROSEQUI - DATE: 03/02/2020

INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 01/31/2020

01/31/2020: INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 01/31/2020

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: FETTER, BRYCE A

02/05/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: FETTER, BRYCE A

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE

02/05/2020: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE

SPECIFIC REQUEST FOR ALL RECORDED EVIDENCE

02/05/2020: SPECIFIC REQUEST FOR ALL RECORDED EVIDENCE

MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE NANCY ALLEY

02/06/2020: MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE NANCY ALLEY

NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MAR 04, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

02/07/2020: NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MAR 04, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/08/2020

01/16/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/08/2020

NOTICE TO APPEAR

01/16/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • HearingTYPE: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; DATE / TIME: 03/04/2020 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 4A CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: KRAUSE, DEBRA L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOLLE PROSEQUI - DATE: 03/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MAR 04, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • HearingTYPE: ARRAIGNMENT; DATE / TIME: 02/06/2020 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 1A CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: KRAUSE, DEBRA L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE NANCY ALLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • Docket(1)PETIT THEFT 812.014(3)(A) M-2: DEFENDANT ENTERED A WRITTEN NOT GUILTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • Docket--JUSTICE BUILDING BEFORE JUDGE DEBRA L. KRAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 03/04/2020 AT 0900AM IN COURTROOM 4A, AT CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF APPEARANCE PREVIOUSLY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPY OF CHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSPECIFIC REQUEST FOR ALL RECORDED EVIDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: FETTER, BRYCE A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED - DATE: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT SET[Z] - DATE: 02/06/2020 - TIME: 0900AM - CTRM: 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(3)(A) - PETIT THEFT DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(3)(A) - LARC RETAIL THEFT/SHOPLIFTING PETIT 1ST OFF 2ND DEG 1ST OFF; OFFENSE DATE: 01/08/2020; STATUS: NOTICE TO APPEAR; BOND AMOUNT SET: 0.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(3)(A) - PETIT THEFT; STATUS: SAME; FILE DATE: 01/31/2020; FINAL ACTION: NOLLE PROSEQUI

    Read MoreRead Less