This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 10/19/2020 at 17:08:22 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS EVANGELISTA, TIMOTHY MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against EVANGELISTA, TIMOTHY MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHASE, MELANIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********058A

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHASE, MELANIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

EVANGELISTA, TIMOTHY MARTINEZ

Sanford, FL 32773

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

ZMIJEWSKI, MICHAEL E

605 East Robinson St, Suite 300

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/23/2020

09/24/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/23/2020

INTAKE SHEET

09/24/2020: INTAKE SHEET

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U520985989 - AMT: $263.00 - NAME: JUANS FIRE

09/24/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U520985989 - AMT: $263.00 - NAME: JUANS FIRE

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U520985993 - AMT: $2000.00 - NAME: JUANS FIRE

09/24/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U520985993 - AMT: $2000.00 - NAME: JUANS FIRE

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U520985987 - AMT: $2000.00 - NAME: JUANS FIRE

09/24/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U520985987 - AMT: $2000.00 - NAME: JUANS FIRE

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U520985988 - AMT: $2000.00 - NAME: JUANS FIRE

09/24/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U520985988 - AMT: $2000.00 - NAME: JUANS FIRE

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U520985990 - AMT: $2000.00 - NAME: JUANS FIRE

09/24/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U520985990 - AMT: $2000.00 - NAME: JUANS FIRE

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U520985991 - AMT: $2000.00 - NAME: JUANS FIRE

09/24/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U520985991 - AMT: $2000.00 - NAME: JUANS FIRE

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U520985992 - AMT: $2000.00 - NAME: JUANS FIRE

09/24/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U520985992 - AMT: $2000.00 - NAME: JUANS FIRE

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT NOV 17, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

09/25/2020: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT NOV 17, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • HearingTYPE: ARRAIGNMENT; DATE / TIME: 11/17/2020 / 0130 PM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 1A CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: CHASE, MELANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPY OF CHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDEMAND FOR FAVORABLE AND IMPEACHMENT INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: ZMIJEWSKI, MICHAEL E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT NOV 17, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $263.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $2000.00 X 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 817.568(2)(A) - FRAUD-IMPERSON USE POSS ID OF ANOTHER PERSON WO CONSENT; ARREST DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 817.568(2)(A) - FRAUD-IMPERSON USE POSS ID OF ANOTHER PERSON WO CONSENT; OFFENSE DATE: 09/23/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 2000.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 817.568(2)(A) - FRAUD-IMPERSON USE POSS ID OF ANOTHER PERSON WO CONSENT; STATUS: SAME; FINAL ACTION:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 817.568(2)(A) - FRAUD-IMPERSON USE POSS ID OF ANOTHER PERSON WO CONSENT; ARREST DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 817.568(2)(A) - FRAUD-IMPERSON USE POSS ID OF ANOTHER PERSON WO CONSENT; OFFENSE DATE: 09/23/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 2000.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 817.568(2)(A) - FRAUD-IMPERSON USE POSS ID OF ANOTHER PERSON WO CONSENT; STATUS: SAME; FINAL ACTION:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(3)(A) - LARC- PETIT FIRST OFFENSE; ARREST DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(3)(A) - LARC- PETIT FIRST OFFENSE; OFFENSE DATE: 09/23/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 263.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(3)(A) - LARC- PETIT FIRST OFFENSE; STATUS: SAME; FINAL ACTION:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 831.09 - PASS FORGED- ALTER BANK BILL NOTE CHECK DRAFT; ARREST DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 831.09 - PASS FORGED- ALTER BANK BILL NOTE CHECK DRAFT; OFFENSE DATE: 09/23/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 2000.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 831.09 - PASS FORGED- ALTER BANK BILL NOTE CHECK DRAFT; STATUS: SAME; FINAL ACTION:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 831.01 - FORGERY; ARREST DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 831.01 - FORGERY; OFFENSE DATE: 09/23/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 2000.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 831.01 - FORGERY; STATUS: SAME; FINAL ACTION:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 831.09 - PASS FORGED- ALTER BANK BILL NOTE CHECK DRAFT; ARREST DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 831.09 - PASS FORGED- ALTER BANK BILL NOTE CHECK DRAFT; OFFENSE DATE: 09/23/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 2000.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 831.09 - PASS FORGED- ALTER BANK BILL NOTE CHECK DRAFT; STATUS: SAME; FINAL ACTION:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 831.01 - FORGERY; ARREST DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 831.01 - FORGERY; OFFENSE DATE: 09/23/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 2000.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 831.01 - FORGERY; STATUS: SAME; FINAL ACTION:

    Read MoreRead Less