Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/10/2021 at 17:28:47 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS EDWARDS, TOMMY LEE

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against EDWARDS, TOMMY LEE. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WOODARD III, JOHN L and NELSON, DEBRA S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********676A

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WOODARD III, JOHN L

NELSON, DEBRA S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

EDWARDS, TOMMY LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

TRETTIS, BLAISE

101 Eslinger Way, 3Rd Floor

Sanford, FL 32772

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FOR VIOLATION OF PROBATION ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE DEBRA S NELSON

03/15/2021: MINUTES FOR VIOLATION OF PROBATION ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE DEBRA S NELSON

JUDGMENT, SENTENCE AND FINGERPRINTS

03/15/2021: JUDGMENT, SENTENCE AND FINGERPRINTS

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 02/27/2021

02/28/2021: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 02/27/2021

INTAKE SHEET

02/28/2021: INTAKE SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialType: FEE - PAYFEE; Comments: AGREEMENT PAY $67.50 MO 05/12/2021; Fine Date: 04/09/2021; Total Assesment: $45.00; Fail Comply: 05/12/2021; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • FinancialPayment Date: 04/07/2021; Receipt Number: 409641; Amount: $9.92;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • FinancialPayment Date: 04/07/2021; Receipt Number: 409641; Amount: $9.93;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • FinancialPayment Date: 04/07/2021; Receipt Number: 409641; Amount: $130.15;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • FinancialPayment Date: 04/07/2021; Receipt Number: 409641; Amount: $50.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketAGREEMENT PAY $67.50 MO 05/12/2021 FEE - AMT: $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketMEMO FROM COMPLIANCE DEPT RE: DEFENDANT ADDRESS CHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL OBLIGATIONS TO THE COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketRECORDED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR NINETY (90) DAYS TO FILE MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2021
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE FOUND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISED OF RIGHTS BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2021
  • DocketMINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE DONNA MCINTOSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2021
  • DocketBOND CONDITIONS IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2021
  • DocketSTATE ATTORNEY TYRONE POLK WAS PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 02/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2021
  • ChargeCHARGE 2 - 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 741.31(4)(A) - VIOLATION OF AN INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC V DISPOSITION - ADJUDICATED GUILTY (03/15/2021); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 741.31(4)(A) - CONTEMPT OF COURT VIOL INJUNCTION PROTECTION DOMESTIC VIOLEN; OFFENSE DATE: 02/27/2021; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 500.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 741.31(4)(A) - VIOLATION OF AN INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC V; STATUS: SAME; FILE DATE: 03/11/2021; FINAL ACTION: FILED; COURT DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 741.31(4)(A) - VIOLATION OF AN INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC V; DECISION DATE: 03/15/2021; ACTION: ADJUDICATED GUILTY; TRIAL TYPE: NONE; FINAL PLEA: NOLO-CONTENDERE; SENTENCE DETAILS; IMPOSED DATED: 03/15/2021; EFFECTIVE DATE: 03/15/2021; JUDGE AT SENTENCING: NELSON, DEBRA S; SENTENCE DESC: SUSP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2021
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY-DOMESTIC VIOLENCE DISPOSITION - ADJUDICATED GUILTY (03/15/2021); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY TOUCH OR STRIKE (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE); OFFENSE DATE: 02/27/2021; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 500.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY-DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; STATUS: SAME; FILE DATE: 03/11/2021; FINAL ACTION: FILED; COURT DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY-DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; DECISION DATE: 03/15/2021; ACTION: ADJUDICATED GUILTY; TRIAL TYPE: NONE; FINAL PLEA: NOLO-CONTENDERE; SENTENCE DETAILS; IMPOSED DATED: 03/15/2021; EFFECTIVE DATE: 03/15/2021; JUDGE AT SENTENCING: NELSON, DEBRA S; SENTENCE DESC: $565.00 TOTAL/12 MONTHS PROB; PROBATION LENGTH: 12 MONTH(S); COURT COST: $ 565.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRETTIS, BLAISE