This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/18/2020 at 17:34:26 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS EDWARD, INDI ED

Case Summary

On 01/19/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against EDWARD, INDI ED. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COLLINS, JERRI and COLLINS, JERRI L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********289A

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COLLINS, JERRI

COLLINS, JERRI L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

EDWARD, INDI ED

Chuluota, FL 32766

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE JERRI COLLINS

02/14/2020: MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE JERRI COLLINS

NO INFORMATION FILED

02/11/2020: NO INFORMATION FILED

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

01/19/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

INTAKE SHEET

01/19/2020: INTAKE SHEET

COUNTY COURT MINUTES STATE ATTORNEY ROBERT SUTTON AND JUDGE ALVA PRESENT

01/19/2020: COUNTY COURT MINUTES STATE ATTORNEY ROBERT SUTTON AND JUDGE ALVA PRESENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • HearingTYPE: ARRAIGNMENT; DATE / TIME: 02/14/2020 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 1A CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: COLLINS, JERRI L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE JERRI COLLINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketSTATE PREVIOUSLY FILED A NO INFORMATION ON 2/11/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketSTATE ATTORNEY GRANT GRIMES WAS PRESENT FOR ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS PRESENT FOR ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT SET[R] - DATE: 02/14/2020 - TIME: 0900AM - CTRM: 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $0.00 - STATUS: ROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketDID NOT FIND PROBABLE CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISED OF RIGHTS BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOUNTY COURT MINUTES STATE ATTORNEY ROBERT SUTTON AND JUDGE ALVA PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE-D/V BATTERY DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE-D/V BATTERY; OFFENSE DATE: 01/18/2020; STATUS: ARREST; RELEASE STATUS: RELEASE ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE; BOND AMOUNT SET: 0.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE-D/V BATTERY; STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 02/11/2020; FINAL ACTION: DROPPED/ABANDONED

    Read MoreRead Less