This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 08/05/2020 at 13:18:49 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS DEY, DANIEL JOSEPH

Case Summary

On 02/01/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DEY, DANIEL JOSEPH. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RECKSIEDLER, JESSICA J and CHASE, MELANIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********296A

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RECKSIEDLER, JESSICA J

CHASE, MELANIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

DEY, DANIEL JOSEPH

Sanford, FL 32771

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER

TRETTIS, BLAISE

101 Eslinger Way, 3Rd Floor

Sanford, FL 32772

 

Court Documents

RECORDED JUDGMENT

03/26/2020: RECORDED JUDGMENT

INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 02/25/2020

02/25/2020: INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 02/25/2020

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT ARRAIGNMENT

03/18/2020: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT ARRAIGNMENT

MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE JESSICA J RECKSIEDLER

03/24/2020: MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE JESSICA J RECKSIEDLER

J&S MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE JESSICA J RECKSIEDLER

03/24/2020: J&S MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE JESSICA J RECKSIEDLER

PLEA AGREEMENT

03/24/2020: PLEA AGREEMENT

RESTITUTION JUDGMENT $200.00 JOSEPH MORALES

03/24/2020: RESTITUTION JUDGMENT $200.00 JOSEPH MORALES

SENTENCING GUIDELINE SCORESHEET

03/24/2020: SENTENCING GUIDELINE SCORESHEET

AFFIDAVIT FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF COSTS OF INVESTIGATION

03/24/2020: AFFIDAVIT FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF COSTS OF INVESTIGATION

COMMITMENT PAPERS ISSUED TO SHERIFF

03/25/2020: COMMITMENT PAPERS ISSUED TO SHERIFF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

02/04/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/31/2020

02/01/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/31/2020

MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE MARK HERR

02/01/2020: MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE MARK HERR

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORDED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMMITMENT PAPERS ISSUED TO SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • HearingTYPE: ARRAIGNMENT; DATE / TIME: 03/24/2020 / 0130 PM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 1A CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: CHASE, MELANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • FinancialTotal Amount Due: $873.20; Total Amount Paid: $0.00; Total Balance Due: $873.20; Total Amount Ordered: $873.20; Total Lien Amount: $873.20; Total Amount Waived: $0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • FinancialType: CRT COST LIEN - 1 CNT#1 BURGLARY OF A CONVEYANCE; Comments: $225ADDCC; $65ADDCC(JUDGMENT 03/24/2020); $50CCTF; $3CJT; $2CJE; $3TEEN COURT; $20CSTF; 03/24/2020; $368.00 REDUCED 03/24/2020; Fine Date: 03/24/2020; Total Assesment: $368.00; Fail Comply: 05/23/2020; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $368.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • FinancialType: FEE LIEN - ATTYFEE; Comments: $100.00 (REDUCED) 03/24/2020; Fine Date: 03/24/2020; Total Assesment: $100.00; Fail Comply: 05/23/2020; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • FinancialType: FEE LIEN - PROSFEE; Comments: $100.00 (REDUCED) 03/24/2020; Fine Date: 03/24/2020; Total Assesment: $100.00; Fail Comply: 05/23/2020; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • FinancialType: FEE LIEN - INVESTIG1; Comments: $305.20 (REDUCED)SEMINOLE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; Fine Date: 03/24/2020; Total Assesment: $305.20; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $305.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • FinancialLien Date: 03/24/2020; Lien Amount: $873.20; Lien percent: 6.83; O.R. Book: 9565; O.R. Page: 42/43; County Recorded: SEMINOLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF COSTS OF INVESTIGATION

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISED OF RIGHTS BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE MARK HERR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER CROSS APPOINTED FROM 19CF2086A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • DocketCOURT FOUND INDIGENT AND APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER KRAMER WAS PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • DocketSTATE ATTORNEY OLIVIA YERGEY WAS PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • ChargeCHARGE 2 - 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(2)(E) - PETIT THEFT - $100 OR MORE, BUT LESS THAN $750 DISPOSITION - ADJUDICATED GUILTY (03/24/2020); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(2)(E) - LARC - PETIT THEFT 1ST DEGREE PROPERTY 100 TO LESS 750 DOLS; OFFENSE DATE: 12/27/2019; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 500.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(2)(E) - PETIT THEFT - $100 OR MORE, BUT LESS THAN $750; STATUS: SAME; FILE DATE: 02/25/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED; COURT DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(2)(E) - PETIT THEFT - $100 OR MORE, BUT LESS THAN $750; DECISION DATE: 03/24/2020; ACTION: ADJUDICATED GUILTY; TRIAL TYPE: NONE; FINAL PLEA: NOLO-CONTENDERE; SENTENCE DETAILS; IMPOSED DATED: 03/24/2020; EFFECTIVE DATE: 03/24/2020; JUDGE AT SENTENCING: CHASE, MELANIE; SENTENCE DESC: JAIL 53 DAYS/53 JAIL CRED; CONFINEMENT TYPE: COUNTY JAIL; CREDIT TIME SERVED: 53 DAYS(S); LENGTH MAX CONFINEMENT: 1 MONTH(S)23 DAYS(S); SENTENCE STATUS: CONCURRENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 810.02(4)(B) - BURGLARY OF A CONVEYANCE DISPOSITION - ADJUDICATED GUILTY (03/24/2020); ARREST DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 810.02(4)(B) - BURGLARY - OF CONVEYANCE (NO PARTS) UNARMED WO PERSON INSIDE; OFFENSE DATE: 12/27/2019; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 5000.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 810.02(4)(B) - BURGLARY OF A CONVEYANCE; STATUS: SAME; FILE DATE: 02/25/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED; COURT DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 810.02(4)(B) - BURGLARY OF A CONVEYANCE; DECISION DATE: 03/24/2020; ACTION: ADJUDICATED GUILTY; TRIAL TYPE: NONE; FINAL PLEA: NOLO-CONTENDERE; SENTENCE DETAILS; IMPOSED DATED: 03/24/2020; EFFECTIVE DATE: 03/24/2020; JUDGE AT SENTENCING: CHASE, MELANIE; SENTENCE DESC: DOC 14 MOS/53 DOC CRED/$368.00; CONFINEMENT TYPE: STATE PRISON FACILITY; CREDIT TIME SERVED: 53 DAYS(S); LENGTH MAX CONFINEMENT: 14 MONTH(S); COURT COST: $ 368.00

    Read MoreRead Less