This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 10/18/2020 at 17:07:38 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS DEWBERRY, LEONARD CHARLES

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DEWBERRY, LEONARD CHARLES. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HERR, MARK E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********052A

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HERR, MARK E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

DEWBERRY, LEONARD CHALRES

Sanford, FL 32773

DEWBERRY, LEONARD CHARLES

Sanford, FL 32773

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER

TRETTIS, BLAISE

101 Eslinger Way, 3Rd Floor

Sanford, FL 32772

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

09/25/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/24/2020

09/24/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/24/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • HearingTYPE: ARRAIGNMENT; DATE / TIME: 10/20/2020 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 1A CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: HERR, MARK E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED - DATE: 09/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • FinancialTotal Amount Due: $50.00; Total Amount Paid: $0.00; Total Balance Due: $50.00; Total Amount Ordered: $50.00; Total Lien Amount: $0; Total Amount Waived: $0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • FinancialType: FEE - AFPDFEE; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY APPROVED 09/24/2020; Fine Date: 09/28/2020; Total Assesment: $50.00; Fail Comply: 10/01/2020; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR NINETY (90) DAYS TO FILE MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPY OF INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDO NOT RETURN TO WAWA AT 1033 STATE ROAD 436, CASSELBERRY, FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT INDIGENT, APPOINT PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketPD LARRY KOWAL WAS PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSTATE ATTORNEY VALEDA ADULOJU WAS PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS ADVISED OF RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS IN CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE SET - DATE: 09/24/2020 - TIME: 0200PM - CTRM: J2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $500.00 X 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less