This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 05/07/2021 at 22:18:27 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS DAVIS, JABARI DAJON

Case Summary

On 11/07/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DAVIS, JABARI DAJON. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NELSON, DEBRA S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********440B

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NELSON, DEBRA S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

DAVIS, JABARI D

Orlando, FL 32808

DAVIS, JABARI DAJON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FUTCH, MATTHEW

Defendant Attorneys

TRETTIS, BLAISE

101 Eslinger Way, 3Rd Floor

Sanford, FL 32772

GERAGHTY, DAN

FALSTAD, DAVID

5840 Red Bug Lake Road, 335

Winter Springs, FL 32708

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE MICHAEL J. RUDISILL

11/07/2020: MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE MICHAEL J. RUDISILL

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 11/06/2020

11/07/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 11/06/2020

WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (2)

02/10/2021: WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (2)

WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (4)

02/09/2021: WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (4)

MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE JESSICA J RECKSIEDLER

02/10/2021: MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE JESSICA J RECKSIEDLER

WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (1)

02/22/2021: WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (1)

INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 12/09/2020

12/09/2020: INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 12/09/2020

CERT OF CONFLICT BY OFF OF REG CRIM AND CIVIL CONFLICT (5TH)

04/09/2021: CERT OF CONFLICT BY OFF OF REG CRIM AND CIVIL CONFLICT (5TH)

MINUTES FOR MOTION BEFORE JUDGE DEBRA S NELSON

12/16/2020: MINUTES FOR MOTION BEFORE JUDGE DEBRA S NELSON

MOTION FOR REDUCTION OF BAIL

12/10/2020: MOTION FOR REDUCTION OF BAIL

MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

03/29/2021: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE DEBRA S NELSON

12/08/2020: MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE DEBRA S NELSON

MINUTES FOR COUNSEL DETERMINATION BEFORE JUDGE JERRI L COLLINS

11/19/2020: MINUTES FOR COUNSEL DETERMINATION BEFORE JUDGE JERRI L COLLINS

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2021
  • HearingTYPE: DOCKET SOUNDING; DATE / TIME: 06/02/2021 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 5C CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4300; JUDGE: NELSON, DEBRA S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED ORDER APPOINTING CONFLICT REGISTRY ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • HearingTYPE: TRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; DATE / TIME: 04/15/2021 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 5C CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4300; JUDGE: NELSON, DEBRA S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketMINUTES FOR TRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE BEFORE JUDGE DEBRA S NELSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docket--DEFENDANT RETURNED TO CUSTODY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docket(1)BATTERY BY PERSON DETAINED IN A DETENTION FACILITY 784.082(3) F-3:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCOURT GRANTED DEFENSE MOTION TO CONTINUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docket--JUSTICE BUILDING BEFORE JUDGE DEBRA S NELSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketDOCKET SOUNDING SET FOR 06/02/2021 AT 0900AM IN COURTROOM 5C, AT CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY FALSTAD, DAVID WAS PRESENT FOR TRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
125 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $30000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2020
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE FOUND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISED OF RIGHTS BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE MICHAEL J. RUDISILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2020
  • DocketBOND CONDITIONS IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2020
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER RANDOLPH KRAMER WAS PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2020
  • DocketSTATE ATTORNEY TYRONE POLK WAS PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 11/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 784.082(3) - BATTERY BY PERSON DETAINED IN A DETENTION FACILITY DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE FELONY - 784.082(1) - AGGRAV BATTERY - BY PERSON DETAINED IN PRISON OR JAIL FACILI; OFFENSE DATE: 11/05/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 30000.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 784.082(3) - BATTERY BY PERSON DETAINED IN A DETENTION FACILITY; STATUS: REDUCED; FILE DATE: 12/09/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FUTCH, MATTHEW