This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 06/30/2020 at 13:11:20 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS DAMBROSE, MARK CHARLES

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DAMBROSE, MARK CHARLES. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NELSON, DEBRA S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********278A

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NELSON, DEBRA S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

DAMBROSE, MARK CHARLES

Oviedo, FL 32766

 

Court Documents

NO INFORMATION FILED

02/19/2020: NO INFORMATION FILED

NOTICE OF CLERK'S FINANCE OF CASH BOND DISPOSITION - BOND#: 2101644

02/20/2020: NOTICE OF CLERK'S FINANCE OF CASH BOND DISPOSITION - BOND#: 2101644

BOND SLIP - TYPE: CA - BOND : 2101644 - AMT: $2000

02/04/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: CA - BOND : 2101644 - AMT: $2000

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT MAR 17, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

02/05/2020: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT MAR 17, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/30/2020

01/31/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/30/2020

INTAKE SHEET

01/31/2020: INTAKE SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketBOND PAID TO DEPOSITOR - BOND#: 2101644 - AMT: $1991.50 - DATE: 02/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CLERK'S FINANCE OF CASH BOND DISPOSITION - BOND#: 2101644

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketBOND DISCHARGED - BOND#: 2101644

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT MAR 17, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT SET[A] - DATE: 03/17/2020 - TIME: 0130PM - CTRM: 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: CA - BOND : 2101644 - AMT: $2000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • HearingTYPE: FIRST APPEARANCE; DATE / TIME: 01/31/2020 / 0200 PM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - J2 CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: WOODARD III, JOHN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE SET - DATE: 01/31/2020 - TIME: 0200PM - CTRM: J2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $2000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 812.014(2)(C)(6) - VEH THEFT- GRAND THEFT OF MOTOR VEH DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 812.014(2)(C)(6) - VEH THEFT- GRAND THEFT OF MOTOR VEH; OFFENSE DATE: 01/30/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 2000.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 812.014(2)(C)(6) - VEH THEFT- GRAND THEFT OF MOTOR VEH; STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 02/19/2020; FINAL ACTION: DROPPED/ABANDONED

    Read MoreRead Less