Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/29/2020 at 14:11:08 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS COTTLE, AUSTIN BRYCE

Case Summary

On 02/16/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against COTTLE, AUSTIN BRYCE. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KRAUSE, DEBRA L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********647A

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KRAUSE, DEBRA L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

COTTLE, AUSTIN BRYCE

Sanford, FL 32771

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED CORRECTED PAYMENT AGREEMENT

03/24/2020: DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED CORRECTED PAYMENT AGREEMENT

RECORDED JUDGMENT

03/11/2020: RECORDED JUDGMENT

MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE DEBRA L. KRAUSE

03/09/2020: MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE DEBRA L. KRAUSE

JUDGMENT, SENTENCE AND FINGERPRINTS

03/09/2020: JUDGMENT, SENTENCE AND FINGERPRINTS

CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: 2020AA029455

03/10/2020: CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: 2020AA029455

AGREEMENT PAY $42.60 MO 03/23/2020 FEE - AMT: $35.00

03/09/2020: AGREEMENT PAY $42.60 MO 03/23/2020 FEE - AMT: $35.00

CORRECTED AGREEMENT PAY - CORRECTED TO INCLUDE PREVIOUS IMPOSED $50 APPLICATION FEE FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER $49.75 MO 03/23/2020 FEE - AMT: $0.00

03/09/2020: CORRECTED AGREEMENT PAY - CORRECTED TO INCLUDE PREVIOUS IMPOSED $50 APPLICATION FEE FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER $49.75 MO 03/23/2020 FEE - AMT: $0.00

DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT

02/28/2020: DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT

INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 02/27/2020

02/27/2020: INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 02/27/2020

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: 2020AA029455 - AMT: $500 - NAME: EMILY

02/19/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: 2020AA029455 - AMT: $500 - NAME: EMILY

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

02/16/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT MAR 09, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

02/20/2020: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT MAR 09, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 02/16/2020

02/16/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 02/16/2020

INTAKE SHEET

02/16/2020: INTAKE SHEET

COUNTY COURT MINUTES STATE ATTORNEY JENNIE HAYES AND JUDGE DEKLEVA PRESENT

02/16/2020: COUNTY COURT MINUTES STATE ATTORNEY JENNIE HAYES AND JUDGE DEKLEVA PRESENT

MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE MARK E HERR

02/17/2020: MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE MARK E HERR

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED CORRECTED PAYMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORDED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • FinancialType: FEE - PAYFEE; Comments: AGREEMENT PAY $42.60 MO 03/23/2020;CORRECTED AGREEMENT PAY - CORRECTED TO INCLUDE PREVIOUS IMPOSED $50 APPLICATION FEE FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER $49.75 MO 03/23/2020; Fine Date: 03/10/2020; Total Assesment: $35.00; Fail Comply: 03/23/2020; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: 2020AA029455

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • HearingTYPE: ARRAIGNMENT; DATE / TIME: 03/09/2020 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 1A CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: KRAUSE, DEBRA L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • FinancialTotal Amount Due: $348.00; Total Amount Paid: $0.00; Total Balance Due: $348.00; Total Amount Ordered: $348.00; Total Lien Amount: $65.00; Total Amount Waived: $0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • FinancialType: CRT COST PARTIAL LIEN - 1 CNT#1 PETIT THEFT - $100 OR MORE BUT LESS THAN $750; Comments: $60ADDCC; $65ADDCC(JUDGMENT 03/09/2020); $50CCTF; $3CJT; $2CJE; $3TEEN COURT; $10CLERK; $20CSTF; 03/09/2020; Fine Date: 03/09/2020; Total Assesment: $213.00; Fail Comply: 09/05/2020; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $213.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • FinancialType: FEE - PROSFEE; Comments: $50.00 03/09/2020; Fine Date: 03/09/2020; Total Assesment: $50.00; Fail Comply: 09/05/2020; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • FinancialLien Date: 03/09/2020; Lien Amount: $65.00; Lien percent: 6.83; O.R. Book: 9554; O.R. Page: 773/774; County Recorded: SEMINOLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRECTED AGREEMENT PAY - CORRECTED TO INCLUDE PREVIOUS IMPOSED $50 APPLICATION FEE FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER $49.75 MO 03/23/2020 FEE - AMT: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2020
  • DocketASSIGN ATTORNEY - NAME: INDIGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2020
  • DocketHEARING REVIEW - DATE: 02/17/2020 - TIME: 0200PM - CTRM: J2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT SET[Z] - DATE: 03/09/2020 - TIME: 0900AM - CTRM: 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT NOT PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOUNTY COURT MINUTES STATE ATTORNEY JENNIE HAYES AND JUDGE DEKLEVA PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2020
  • DocketTHIS CASE IS CONTINUED TO FIRST APPEARANCE ON 2/17/20 2PM BEFORE JUDGE HERR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 02/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(3)(B) - PETIT THEFT - $100 OR MORE BUT LESS THAN $750 DISPOSITION - ADJUDICATED GUILTY (03/09/2020); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(2)(E) - LARC-RETAIL THEFT/SHOPLIFTING PETIT THEFT 1ST DEGREE PROPERT; OFFENSE DATE: 02/15/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 500.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(3)(B) - PETIT THEFT - $100 OR MORE BUT LESS THAN $750; STATUS: AMENDED; FILE DATE: 02/27/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED; COURT DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(3)(B) - PETIT THEFT - $100 OR MORE BUT LESS THAN $750; DECISION DATE: 03/09/2020; ACTION: ADJUDICATED GUILTY; TRIAL TYPE: NONE; FINAL PLEA: NOLO-CONTENDERE; SENTENCE DETAILS; IMPOSED DATED: 03/09/2020; EFFECTIVE DATE: 03/09/2020; JUDGE AT SENTENCING: KRAUSE, DEBRA L.; SENTENCE DESC: $213.00 TOTAL; COURT COST: $ 213.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant