This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/18/2020 at 18:34:56 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS CLAYTON III, THOMAS BROOKS

Case Summary

On 01/19/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CLAYTON III, THOMAS BROOKS. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALVA, MARLENE M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********195A

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALVA, MARLENE M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

CLAYTON, THOMAS BROOKS

Casselberry, FL 32707

CLAYTON III, THOMAS BROOKS

Casselberry, FL 32707

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERNANDEZ, DANIEL

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER

TRETTIS, BLAISE

101 Eslinger Way, 3Rd Floor

Sanford, FL 32772

PARSONS, ALPHEUS C

101 Bush Blvd

Sanford, FL 32773

 

Court Documents

COURT VERIFICATION FORM

07/01/2020: COURT VERIFICATION FORM

COMMITMENT PAPERS ISSUED TO SHERIFF

07/01/2020: COMMITMENT PAPERS ISSUED TO SHERIFF

RECORDED JUDGMENT

06/24/2020: RECORDED JUDGMENT

MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE M ALVA

06/17/2020: MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE M ALVA

MINUTES FOR TRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE M ALVA

05/28/2020: MINUTES FOR TRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE M ALVA

SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

05/21/2020: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED AMENDED NOTICE FOR TRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE

04/27/2020: DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED AMENDED NOTICE FOR TRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE

DEFENDANT'S WITNESS LIST

04/24/2020: DEFENDANT'S WITNESS LIST

WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (1)

04/07/2020: WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (1)

WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (3)

03/31/2020: WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (3)

PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (8)

03/25/2020: PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (8)

DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED DOCKET SOUNDING NOTICE

03/13/2020: DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED DOCKET SOUNDING NOTICE

MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE M ALVA

03/03/2020: MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE M ALVA

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

02/26/2020: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

01/22/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

01/19/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

INTAKE SHEET

01/19/2020: INTAKE SHEET

MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE ALVA

01/19/2020: MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE ALVA

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMMITMENT PAPERS ISSUED TO SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT VERIFICATION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORDED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • FinancialTotal Amount Due: $1130.00; Total Amount Paid: $0.00; Total Balance Due: $1130.00; Total Amount Ordered: $1130.00; Total Lien Amount: $1130.00; Total Amount Waived: $0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • FinancialType: CRT COST LIEN - 1 CNT#1 BATTERY UPON A PERSON SIXTY FIVE YEARS OF AGE OR OLDER; Comments: $225ADDCC; $65ADDCC(JUDGMENT 06/22/2020); $50CCTF; $3CJT; $2CJE; $3TEEN COURT; $20CSTF; $201DVTF; $151RCPTF; 06/22/2020; $720.00 REDUCED 06/22/2020; Fine Date: 06/22/2020; Total Assesment: $720.00; Fail Comply: 08/21/2020; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $720.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • FinancialType: FEE LIEN - ATTYFEE; Comments: $100.00 (REDUCED) 06/22/2020; Fine Date: 06/22/2020; Total Assesment: $100.00; Fail Comply: 08/21/2020; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • FinancialType: FEE LIEN - PROSFEE; Comments: $100.00 (REDUCED) 06/22/2020; Fine Date: 06/22/2020; Total Assesment: $100.00; Fail Comply: 08/21/2020; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • FinancialType: FEE LIEN - INVESTIG1; Comments: $210.00 (REDUCED)CASSELBERRY POLICE DEPARTMENT; Fine Date: 06/22/2020; Total Assesment: $210.00; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $210.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • FinancialLien Date: 06/22/2020; Lien Amount: $1,130.00; Lien percent: 6.66; O.R. Book: 9631; O.R. Page: 1136/1137; County Recorded: SEMINOLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOST OF INVESTIGATION AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $3500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT SET[E] - DATE: 03/03/2020 - TIME: 0130PM - CTRM: 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketASSIGN ATTORNEY - NAME: PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE FOUND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISED OF RIGHTS BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 784.08(2)(C) - BATTERY UPON A PERSON SIXTY FIVE YEARS OF AGE OR OLDER DISPOSITION - ADJUDICATED GUILTY (06/22/2020); ARREST DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 784.08(2)(C) - BATTERY-(FELONY THIRD DEGREE) ON PERSON 65 YEARS OF AGE OR O; OFFENSE DATE: 01/18/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 3500.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 784.08(2)(C) - BATTERY UPON A PERSON SIXTY FIVE YEARS OF AGE OR OLDER; STATUS: SAME; FILE DATE: 02/10/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED; COURT DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 784.08(2)(C) - BATTERY UPON A PERSON SIXTY FIVE YEARS OF AGE OR OLDER; DECISION DATE: 06/22/2020; ACTION: ADJUDICATED GUILTY; TRIAL TYPE: NONE; FINAL PLEA: NOLO-CONTENDERE; SENTENCE DETAILS; IMPOSED DATED: 06/22/2020; EFFECTIVE DATE: 06/22/2020; JUDGE AT SENTENCING: ALVA, MARLENE M; SENTENCE DESC: DOC 1 YRS 1 DAYS/164 DOC CRED/; CONFINEMENT TYPE: STATE PRISON FACILITY; CREDIT TIME SERVED: 164 DAYS(S); LENGTH MAX CONFINEMENT: 1 YEAR(S)1 DAYS(S); COURT COST: $ 720.00

    Read MoreRead Less