This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/22/2020 at 14:13:11 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS CLARK, KENDELL TRIMIAN

Case Summary

On 01/19/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CLARK, KENDELL TRIMIAN. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NELSON, DEBRA S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********197A

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NELSON, DEBRA S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

CLARK, KENDELL TRIMIAN

Sanford, FL 32773

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VAZQUEZ, PERSIDA E

101 Bush Blvd.

Sanford, FL 32773

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER/PROVISIONAL

TRETTIS, BLAISE

101 Eslinger Way, 3Rd Floor

Sanford, FL 32772

MACKHANLALL, LANISE PARKER

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FOR TRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE BEFORE JUDGE DEBRA S NELSON

07/09/2020: MINUTES FOR TRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE BEFORE JUDGE DEBRA S NELSON

MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE DEBRA S NELSON

07/01/2020: MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE DEBRA S NELSON

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS

05/20/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS

MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE DEBRA S NELSON

05/06/2020: MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE DEBRA S NELSON

SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

04/21/2020: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE DEBRA S NELSON

04/08/2020: MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE DEBRA S NELSON

WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (1)

04/08/2020: WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (1)

WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (5)

04/09/2020: WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (5)

PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (1)

04/01/2020: PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (1)

DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED DOCKET SOUNDING

03/02/2020: DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED DOCKET SOUNDING

MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE DEBRA S NELSON

02/18/2020: MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE DEBRA S NELSON

NOTICE FOR DOCKET SOUNDING APR 08, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

02/19/2020: NOTICE FOR DOCKET SOUNDING APR 08, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

02/12/2020: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 01/30/2020

01/30/2020: INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 01/30/2020

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

01/22/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

01/19/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

01/19/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE ALVA

01/19/2020: MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE ALVA

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2020
  • HearingTYPE: DOCKET SOUNDING; DATE / TIME: 08/12/2020 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 5C CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: NELSON, DEBRA S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • HearingTYPE: TRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; DATE / TIME: 07/09/2020 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 5C CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: NELSON, DEBRA S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FOR TRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE BEFORE JUDGE DEBRA S NELSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketALL CHARGES: DEFENDANT RETURNED TO CUSTODY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketWAIVED SPEEDY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketCOURT GRANTED DEFENSE MOTION TO CONTINUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • Docket--JUSTICE BUILDING BEFORE JUDGE DEBRA S NELSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketDOCKET SOUNDING SET FOR 08/12/2020 AT 0900AM IN COURTROOM 5C, AT CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketPD MACKHANLALL, LANISE PARKER WAS PRESENT FOR TRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • Docket--CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
93 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2020
  • Docket$50 APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FEE SHALL BE PAID TO THE CLERK OF THE COURT WITHIN 7 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketBOND CONDITIONS IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketCOURT FOUND INDIGENT AND APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketSWORN TO AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER KRAMER WAS PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketSTATE ATTORNEY ROBERT SUTTON WAS PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 2 - 2nd DEGREE FELONY - 784.045(1)(A)(1) - AGGRAVATED BATTERY DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(2) - BATTERY- CAUSE BODILY HARM; OFFENSE DATE: 01/18/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 500.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE FELONY - 784.045(1)(A)(1) - AGGRAVATED BATTERY; STATUS: AMENDED; FILE DATE: 01/30/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 1st DEGREE FELONY - 810.02(2)(A) - BURGLARY OF A DWELLING WITH A BATTERY PBL DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE FELONY - 810.02(3)(C) - BURGL-STRUCTURE- STRUCTURE UNARMED W PERSON INSIDE; OFFENSE DATE: 01/18/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 5000.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE FELONY - 810.02(2)(A) - BURGLARY OF A DWELLING WITH A BATTERY PBL; STATUS: AMENDED; FILE DATE: 01/30/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less