This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/20/2020 at 17:44:34 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS CHERRY, JENNIFER LAUREN

Case Summary

On 01/19/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CHERRY, JENNIFER LAUREN. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MCINTOSH, DONNA L and SOUTO, MELISSA D.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********193A

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MCINTOSH, DONNA L

SOUTO, MELISSA D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

CHERRY, JENNIFER LAUREN

Winter Springs, FL 32708

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POLK, JACOB

101 Bush Blvd

Sanford, FL 32773

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER/PROVISIONAL

TRETTIS, BLAISE

101 Eslinger Way, 3Rd Floor

Sanford, FL 32772

MEGARO, DANIEL

 

Court Documents

DEMAND FOR PAYMENT -COMPLIANCE DEP- - DATE: 07/21/2020

07/16/2020: DEMAND FOR PAYMENT -COMPLIANCE DEP- - DATE: 07/21/2020

FINANCIAL OBLIGATIONS TO THE COURT

06/30/2020: FINANCIAL OBLIGATIONS TO THE COURT

MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE DONNA L MCINTOSH

06/24/2020: MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE DONNA L MCINTOSH

J&S MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE DONNA L MCINTOSH

06/24/2020: J&S MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE DONNA L MCINTOSH

CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U520818322

06/25/2020: CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U520818322

PLEA AGREEMENT

06/24/2020: PLEA AGREEMENT

SENTENCING GUIDELINE SCORESHEET

06/24/2020: SENTENCING GUIDELINE SCORESHEET

MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE DONNA L MCINTOSH

05/13/2020: MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE DONNA L MCINTOSH

WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (1)

04/02/2020: WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (1)

RESP NOTC DISC/DMD NOTC CLAIM ALIBI/DMD INT ISS SUBP DUC TEC

03/17/2020: RESP NOTC DISC/DMD NOTC CLAIM ALIBI/DMD INT ISS SUBP DUC TEC

MOTION TO MODIFY BOND CONDITIONS

02/26/2020: MOTION TO MODIFY BOND CONDITIONS

MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE DONNA L MCINTOSH

03/10/2020: MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE DONNA L MCINTOSH

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U520818322 - AMT: $3500 - NAME: JUANS FIRE

01/28/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U520818322 - AMT: $3500 - NAME: JUANS FIRE

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT MAR 10, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

01/29/2020: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT MAR 10, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

01/22/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

01/19/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

INTAKE SHEET

01/19/2020: INTAKE SHEET

MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE ALVA

01/19/2020: MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE ALVA

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR PAYMENT -COMPLIANCE DEP- - DATE: 07/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINANCIAL OBLIGATIONS TO THE COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORDED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U520818322

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • HearingTYPE: DOCKET SOUNDING; DATE / TIME: 06/24/2020 / 0830 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 5A CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: SOUTO, MELISSA D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • FinancialTotal Amount Due: $970.00; Total Amount Paid: $0.00; Total Balance Due: $970.00; Total Amount Ordered: $970.00; Total Lien Amount: $65.00; Total Amount Waived: $0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • FinancialType: CRT COST PARTIAL LIEN - 1 CNT#1 BATTERY UPON A PERSON SIXTY FIVE YEARS OF AGE OR OLDER; Comments: $225ADDCC; $65ADDCC(JUDGMENT 06/24/2020); $50CCTF; $3CJT; $2CJE; $3TEEN COURT; $20CSTF; $201DVTF; $151RCPTF; 06/24/2020; Fine Date: 06/24/2020; Total Assesment: $720.00; Fail Comply: 08/23/2020; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $720.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • FinancialType: FEE - ATTYFEE; Comments: $100.00 06/24/2020; Fine Date: 06/24/2020; Total Assesment: $100.00; Fail Comply: 08/23/2020; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • FinancialType: FEE - PROSFEE; Comments: $100.00 06/24/2020; Fine Date: 06/24/2020; Total Assesment: $100.00; Fail Comply: 08/23/2020; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • FinancialLien Date: 06/24/2020; Lien Amount: $65.00; Lien percent: 6.66; O.R. Book: 9634; O.R. Page: 1475/1476; County Recorded: SEMINOLE

    Read MoreRead Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2020
  • Docket$50 APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FEE SHALL BE PAID TO THE CLERK OF THE COURT WITHIN 7 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketBOND SET PER THE COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketCOURT FOUND INDIGENT AND APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketBOND CONDITIONS IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketSWORN TO AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER KRAMER WAS PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketSTATE ATTORNEY ROBERT SUTTON WAS PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 784.08(2)(C) - BATTERY UPON A PERSON SIXTY FIVE YEARS OF AGE OR OLDER DISPOSITION - ADJUDICATED GUILTY (06/24/2020); ARREST DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 784.08(2)(C) - BATTERY-(FELONY THIRD DEGREE) ON PERSON 65 YEARS OF AGE OR O; OFFENSE DATE: 01/17/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 3500.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 784.08(2)(C) - BATTERY UPON A PERSON SIXTY FIVE YEARS OF AGE OR OLDER; STATUS: SAME; FILE DATE: 03/02/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED; COURT DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 784.08(2)(C) - BATTERY UPON A PERSON SIXTY FIVE YEARS OF AGE OR OLDER; DECISION DATE: 06/24/2020; ACTION: ADJUDICATED GUILTY; TRIAL TYPE: NONE; FINAL PLEA: NOLO-CONTENDERE; SENTENCE DETAILS; IMPOSED DATED: 06/24/2020; EFFECTIVE DATE: 06/24/2020; JUDGE AT SENTENCING: SOUTO, MELISSA D.; SENTENCE DESC: PROB 1 YRS 6 MOS/$720.00 TOTAL; PROBATION LENGTH: 1 YEAR(S)6 MONTH(S); COURT COST: $ 720.00

    Read MoreRead Less