This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 01/14/2022 at 15:38:35 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS CETTO, JENNA TERRY

Case Summary

On 12/15/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CETTO, JENNA TERRY. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are NELSON, DEBRA S and MCINTOSH, DONNA L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********774A

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

NELSON, DEBRA S

MCINTOSH, DONNA L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

CETTO, JENNA TERRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VAZQUEZ, PERSIDA E

101 Bush Blvd.

Sanford, FL 32773

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER

TRETTIS, BLAISE

101 Eslinger Way, 3Rd Floor

Sanford, FL 32772

FALSTAD, DAVID

5840 Red Bug Lake Road 335 Winter

Springs, FL 32708

 

Court Documents

RECORDED JUDGMENT

08/31/2021: RECORDED JUDGMENT

MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE DONNA L MCINTOSH

08/11/2021: MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE DONNA L MCINTOSH

J&S MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE DONNA L MCINTOSH

08/11/2021: J&S MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE DONNA L MCINTOSH

PLEA AGREEMENT

08/11/2021: PLEA AGREEMENT

SENTENCING GUIDELINE SCORESHEET

08/11/2021: SENTENCING GUIDELINE SCORESHEET

COMMITMENT PAPERS ISSUED TO SHERIFF

08/13/2021: COMMITMENT PAPERS ISSUED TO SHERIFF

DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED NOTICE

07/12/2021: DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED NOTICE

MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE NANCY ALLEY

06/30/2021: MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE NANCY ALLEY

NOTICE FOR DOCKET SOUNDING AUG 11, 2021 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

07/01/2021: NOTICE FOR DOCKET SOUNDING AUG 11, 2021 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (1)

05/18/2021: WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (1)

MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE DEBRA S NELSON

05/05/2021: MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE DEBRA S NELSON

WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (1)

04/30/2021: WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (1)

WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

04/06/2021: WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE DEBRA S NELSON

04/07/2021: MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE DEBRA S NELSON

NOTICE FOR DOCKET SOUNDING MAY 05, 2021 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

04/08/2021: NOTICE FOR DOCKET SOUNDING MAY 05, 2021 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED

03/10/2021: WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED

WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (1)

03/08/2021: WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (1)

WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (1)

02/26/2021: WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (1)

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORDED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMMITMENT PAPERS ISSUED TO SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • HearingTYPE: DOCKET SOUNDING; DATE / TIME: 08/11/2021 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 5C CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4300; JUDGE: MCINTOSH, DONNA L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • FinancialTotal Amount Due: $651.00; Total Amount Paid: $0.00; Total Balance Due: $651.00; Total Amount Ordered: $651.00; Total Lien Amount: $651.00; Total Amount Waived: $0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • FinancialType: CRT COST LIEN - ADZ6R0E CNT#1 LEAVING SCENE OF CRASH RESULTING IN SERIOUS BODILY INJURY CIT# ADZ6R0E; Comments: $225ADDCC; $65ADDCC(JUDGMENT 08/11/2021); $50CCTF; $3CJT; $2CJE; $3TEEN COURT; $20CSTF; $30SCF; $3 RADIO; 08/11/2021; $401.00 REDUCED 08/11/2021; Fine Date: 08/11/2021; Total Assesment: $401.00; Fail Comply: 10/10/2021; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • FinancialType: FEE LIEN - ATTYFEE; Comments: $100.00 (REDUCED) 08/11/2021; Fine Date: 08/11/2021; Total Assesment: $100.00; Fail Comply: 10/10/2021; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • FinancialType: FEE LIEN - PROSFEE; Comments: $100.00 (REDUCED) 08/11/2021; Fine Date: 08/11/2021; Total Assesment: $100.00; Fail Comply: 10/10/2021; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • FinancialLien Date: 08/11/2021; Lien Amount: $651.00; Lien percent: 4.25; Instrument: 20210518124; County Recorded: ORANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSENTENCING GUIDELINE SCORESHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
203 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS IN CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE SET - DATE: 12/15/2020 - TIME: 0200PM - CTRM: J2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $8000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $20000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 12/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION(S): ADZ6R1E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION(S): ADZ6R0E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 322.34(6)(A) - DRIVING WHILE LICENSE SUSPENDED OR REVOKED DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 322.34(6)(A) - DRIVING WHILE LICENSE SUSPENDED OR REVOKED; OFFENSE DATE: 12/03/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 8000.00; CITATION NUMBER: ADZ6R1E; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 322.34(6)(A) - DRIVING WHILE LICENSE SUSPENDED OR REVOKED; STATUS: SAME; FILE DATE: 01/04/2021; FINAL ACTION: NO ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 2nd DEGREE FELONY - 316.027(2)(B) - LEAVING SCENE OF CRASH RESULTING IN SERIOUS BODILY INJURY DISPOSITION - ADJUDICATED GUILTY (08/11/2021); ARREST DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE FELONY - 316.027(2)(B) - CRASH - LEAVING SCENE ON PUBLIC OR PRIVATE PROPERTY WITHOUT; OFFENSE DATE: 12/03/2020; STATUS: ARREST; RELEASE STATUS: NO BOND; BOND AMOUNT SET: 0.00; CITATION NUMBER: ADZ6R0E; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE FELONY - 316.027(2)(B) - LEAVING SCENE OF CRASH RESULTING IN SERIOUS BODILY INJURY; STATUS: SAME; FILE DATE: 01/04/2021; FINAL ACTION: FILED; COURT DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE FELONY - 316.027(2)(B) - LEAVING SCENE OF CRASH RESULTING IN SERIOUS BODILY INJURY; DECISION DATE: 08/11/2021; ACTION: ADJUDICATED GUILTY; TRIAL TYPE: NONE; FINAL PLEA: NOLO-CONTENDERE; SENTENCE DETAILS; IMPOSED DATED: 08/11/2021; EFFECTIVE DATE: 08/11/2021; JUDGE AT SENTENCING: MCINTOSH, DONNA L; SENTENCE DESC: DOC 14 MOS/197 DOC CRED/$401.0; CONFINEMENT TYPE: STATE PRISON FACILITY; CREDIT TIME SERVED: 197 DAYS(S); DRIVER'S LIC REVOKED: 3 YEAR(S); LENGTH MAX CONFINEMENT: 14 MONTH(S); COURT COST: $ 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VAZQUEZ, PERSIDA E