This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 10/18/2020 at 17:06:35 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS BUTLER, GARRETT JAMES

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BUTLER, GARRETT JAMES. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHASE, MELANIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********056A

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHASE, MELANIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BUTLER, GARRETT JAMES

Altamonte Springs, FL 32701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

LINDSEY, WARREN W

Po Box 505, 1150 Louisiana Ave Suite 2

Winter Park, FL 32789

 

Court Documents

NO INFORMATION FILED

10/12/2020: NO INFORMATION FILED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: LINDSEY, WARREN W

10/01/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: LINDSEY, WARREN W

MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

09/24/2020: MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

INTAKE SHEET

09/24/2020: INTAKE SHEET

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/24/2020

09/24/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/24/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CLERK'S FINANCE OF CASH BOND DISPOSITION - BOND#: 2102065

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CLERK'S FINANCE OF CASH BOND DISPOSITION - BOND#: 2102064

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketBOND DISCHARGED - BOND#: 2102065

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketBOND DISCHARGED - BOND#: 2102064

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR TEN (10) DAYS TO FILE MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDO NOT RETURN TO 380 LAKE MEADE COURT, UNIT 202, ALTAMONTE SPRINGS, FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNO CONTACT WITH OCEAN VASQUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSTATE ATTORNEY VALEDA ADULOJU WAS PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS ADVISED OF RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS IN CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE SET - DATE: 09/24/2020 - TIME: 0200PM - CTRM: J2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - STATUS: NOB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $2000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less