This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 10/18/2020 at 17:07:11 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS BURGOS, RENE

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BURGOS, RENE. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HERR, MARK E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********054A

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HERR, MARK E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BURGOS, RENE

Orlando, FL 32808

 

Court Documents

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/23/2020

09/24/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/23/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2020
  • HearingTYPE: ARRAIGNMENT; DATE / TIME: 10/21/2020 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 1A CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: HERR, MARK E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED - DATE: 10/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT OCT 21, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U520986002 - AMT: $500 - NAME: NATIVEBAIL FIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • HearingTYPE: FIRST APPEARANCE; DATE / TIME: 09/24/2020 / 0200 PM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - J2 CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: SCHOTT, FREDERIC M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketMINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 10/21/2020 AT 0900AM IN COURTROOM 1A WITH JUDGE MARK E HERR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • Docket--M-1: BOND SET IN AMOUNT: $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • Docket(0)LARC - RETAIL THEFT/SHOPLIFTING PETIT THEFT 1ST DEGREE PROPE 812.014(2)(E)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDO NOT RETURN TO LOWES AT 6735 SOUTH US HIGHWAY 17-92, FERN PARK, FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNO CONTACT WITH CARLOS MARQUES JOHNSON OUTSIDE OF JAIL AND/OR KHALIF WILSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSTATE ATTORNEY VALEDA ADULOJU WAS PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS ADVISED OF RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS IN CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE SET - DATE: 09/24/2020 - TIME: 0200PM - CTRM: J2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(2)(E) - PETIT THEFT-$100 OR MORE, BUT LESS THAN $750 DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(2)(E) - LARC - RETAIL THEFT/SHOPLIFTING PETIT THEFT 1ST DEGREE PROPE; OFFENSE DATE: 09/23/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 500.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(2)(E) - PETIT THEFT-$100 OR MORE, BUT LESS THAN $750; STATUS: SAME; FILE DATE: 10/05/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less