This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 10/18/2020 at 17:04:08 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS BORDERS, RASHAAD SUAVE

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BORDERS, RASHAAD SUAVE. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SOUTO, MELISSA D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********055A

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SOUTO, MELISSA D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BORDERS, RASHAAD SUAVE

Sanford, FL 32771

 

Court Documents

INTAKE SHEET

09/24/2020: INTAKE SHEET

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT NOV 03, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

09/28/2020: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT NOV 03, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/24/2020

09/24/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/24/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2020
  • HearingTYPE: ARRAIGNMENT; DATE / TIME: 11/03/2020 / 0130 PM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 1A CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: SOUTO, MELISSA D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U520985995

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketBOND DISCHARGED - BOND#: U520985995

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED - DATE: 09/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT NOV 03, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT SET[J] - DATE: 11/03/2020 - TIME: 0130PM - CTRM: 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND : U520985994 - AMT: $5000.00 - NAME: CRUM&FORESTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND : U520985995 - AMT: $2000.00 - NAME: CRUM&FORESTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • HearingTYPE: FIRST APPEARANCE; DATE / TIME: 09/24/2020 / 0200 PM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - J2 CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: SCHOTT, FREDERIC M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 951.22(1) - SMUGGLE CONTRABAND- INTRODUCE INTO COUNTY DETENTION FACILITY DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 951.22(1) - SMUGGLE CONTRABAND- INTRODUCE INTO COUNTY DETENTION FACILITY; OFFENSE DATE: 09/24/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 2000.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 951.22(1) - SMUGGLE CONTRABAND- INTRODUCE INTO COUNTY DETENTION FACILITY; STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 09/29/2020; FINAL ACTION: NO ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 893.13(6)(A) - POSSESSION OF ALPRAZOLAM DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE FELONY - 893.13(1)(A)(1) - DRUGS-POSSESS- POSESSION OF A CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE; OFFENSE DATE: 09/24/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 5000.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 893.13(6)(A) - POSSESSION OF ALPRAZOLAM; STATUS: REDUCED; FILE DATE: 09/29/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE SET - DATE: 09/24/2020 - TIME: 0200PM - CTRM: J2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $2000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $5000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less