Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/09/2021 at 17:16:33 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS BATCHELOR, JUSTIN ADAM

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BATCHELOR, JUSTIN ADAM. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KRAUSE, DEBRA L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********655A

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KRAUSE, DEBRA L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BATCHELOR, JUSTIN ADAM

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE WAYNE CULVER

03/01/2021: MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE WAYNE CULVER

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 03/01/2021

03/01/2021: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 03/01/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U521100550

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketBOND DISCHARGED - BOND#: U521100550

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNO INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT MAR 31, 2021 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U521100550 - AMT: $500 - NAME: MAGIC FIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • HearingTYPE: FIRST APPEARANCE; DATE / TIME: 03/01/2021 / 0200 PM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - J2 CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: CULVER, WAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY TOUCH OR STRIKE - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY TOUCH OR STRIKE - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; OFFENSE DATE: 03/01/2021; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 500.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY TOUCH OR STRIKE - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 03/18/2021; FINAL ACTION: DROPPED/ABANDONED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE WAYNE CULVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docket--KRAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docket--ADDRESS.DEFENDANT MAY HAVE ONLY TELEPHONIC CONTACT IF IT IS REGARDS TO THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketTHE DEFENDANT IS NOT TO GO WITHIN 1500 FEET OF THE NO RETURN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docket--APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSTATE ATTORNEY VALEDA ADULOJU VIA MICROSOFT TEAMS WAS PRESENT FOR FIRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS ADVISED OF RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS IN CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE SET - DATE: 03/01/2021 - TIME: 0200PM - CTRM: J2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - STATUS: NOB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 03/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant