This case was last updated from Seminole County - Eighteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/31/2022 at 21:03:21 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS BAKER JR, JOSEPH CHARLES

Case Summary

On 05/04/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BAKER JR, JOSEPH CHARLES. This case was filed in Seminole County - Eighteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ORTH, WILLIAM S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********067A

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ORTH, WILLIAM S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BAKER JR, JOSEPH CHARLES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

BIGNEY, DAVID R

215 E Livingston St

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

CAPIAS SIGNED AND ISSUED - DATE: 05/05/2022

05/05/2022: CAPIAS SIGNED AND ISSUED - DATE: 05/05/2022

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS/CAPIAS

05/04/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS/CAPIAS

INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 05/04/2022

05/04/2022: INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 05/04/2022

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT JUN 21, 2022 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

05/13/2022: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT JUN 21, 2022 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U521352912 - AMT: $2000 - NAME: JUANS FIRE

05/11/2022: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U521352912 - AMT: $2000 - NAME: JUANS FIRE

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 05/10/2022

05/11/2022: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 05/10/2022

CAPIAS RETURNED EXECUTED

05/16/2022: CAPIAS RETURNED EXECUTED

DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED NOTICE

06/01/2022: DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED NOTICE

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE

06/09/2022: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE

DEFENSE DEMAND FOR EXCULPATORY INFORMATION

06/09/2022: DEFENSE DEMAND FOR EXCULPATORY INFORMATION

DEMAND FOR DISCLOSURE OF CRIMINAL RECORDS

06/09/2022: DEMAND FOR DISCLOSURE OF CRIMINAL RECORDS

WRITTEN NOTICE FOR DEFENSE DISCOVERY

06/09/2022: WRITTEN NOTICE FOR DEFENSE DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

06/09/2022: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: BIGNEY, DAVID R

06/09/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: BIGNEY, DAVID R

NOTICE FOR DOCKET SOUNDING AUG 24, 2022 AT 08:30 AM PRINTED

06/22/2022: NOTICE FOR DOCKET SOUNDING AUG 24, 2022 AT 08:30 AM PRINTED

MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE WILLIAM S. ORTH

06/21/2022: MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE WILLIAM S. ORTH

DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED DOCKET SOUNDING NOTICE

07/05/2022: DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED DOCKET SOUNDING NOTICE

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • HearingType: DOCKET SOUNDING; DATE / TIME: 08/24/2022 / 0830 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 5B CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4300; JUDGE: ORTH, WILLIAM S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED DOCKET SOUNDING NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE FOR DOCKET SOUNDING AUG 24, 2022 AT 08:30 AM PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • HearingType: ARRAIGNMENT; DATE / TIME: 06/21/2022 / 0130 PM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 1A CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4300; JUDGE: ORTH, WILLIAM S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE WILLIAM S. ORTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • Docket--CONTINUED ON BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • Docket(1)POSSESSION OF MORE THAN 20 GRAMS OF CANNABIS 893.13(6)(A) F-3: DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • Docket--ENTERED A PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • Docket(1)POSSESSION OF MORE THAN 20 GRAMS OF CANNABIS 893.13(6)(A) F-3: DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • Docket--JUSTICE BUILDING BEFORE JUDGE WILLIAM S. ORTH

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT JUN 21, 2022 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT SET[E] - DATE: 06/21/2022 - TIME: 0130PM - CTRM: 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U521352912 - AMT: $2000 - NAME: JUANS FIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 05/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCAPIAS SIGNED AND ISSUED - DATE: 05/05/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $2000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCAPIAS ISSUED DIRECT - DATE: 05/04/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS/CAPIAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED - DATE: 05/04/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 893.13(6)(A) - POSSESSION OF MORE THAN 20 GRAMS OF CANNABIS DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 893.13(6)(A) - POSSESSION OF MORE THAN 20 GRAMS OF CANNABIS; OFFENSE DATE: 07/13/2021; STATUS: SWORN COMPLAINT; BOND AMOUNT SET: 2000.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 893.13(6)(A) - POSSESSION OF MORE THAN 20 GRAMS OF CANNABIS; STATUS: SAME; FILE DATE: 05/04/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID BIGNEY