This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 06/17/2020 at 19:12:49 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS ACEVEDO CARDONA, MELVIN OMAR

Case Summary

On 01/19/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ACEVEDO CARDONA, MELVIN OMAR. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RECKSIEDLER, JESSICA J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********198A

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RECKSIEDLER, JESSICA J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ACEVEDO CARDONA, MELVIN OMAR

Maitland, FL 32751

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER

TRETTIS, BLAISE

101 Eslinger Way, 3Rd Floor

Sanford, FL 32772

 

Court Documents

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U520833380 - AMT: $4000 - NAME: JUANS FIRE

02/13/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U520833380 - AMT: $4000 - NAME: JUANS FIRE

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 25, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

02/14/2020: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 25, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

NO INFORMATION FILED

02/17/2020: NO INFORMATION FILED

CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U520833380

02/19/2020: CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U520833380

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

01/22/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

01/19/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE ALVA

01/19/2020: MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE ALVA

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • HearingTYPE: ARRAIGNMENT; DATE / TIME: 02/25/2020 / 0130 PM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 1A CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: RECKSIEDLER, JESSICA J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U520833380

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketBOND DISCHARGED - BOND#: U520833380

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 25, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U520833380 - AMT: $4000 - NAME: JUANS FIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR (90) DAYS TO FILE MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPY OF INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISED OF RIGHTS BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE ALVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketCROSS APPOINT PUBLIC DEFENDER FROM CASE 20MM225A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketBOND CONDITIONS IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketCOURT FOUND INDIGENT AND APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER KRAMER WAS PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketSTATE ATTORNEY ROBERT SUTTON WAS PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 784.021(1)(A) - AGGRAV ASSLT - WEAPON - WITH A DEADLY WEAPON WITHOUT INTENT DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 784.021(1)(A) - AGGRAV ASSLT - WEAPON - WITH A DEADLY WEAPON WITHOUT INTENT; OFFENSE DATE: 01/18/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 4000.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 784.021(1)(A) - AGGRAV ASSLT - WEAPON - WITH A DEADLY WEAPON WITHOUT INTENT; STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 02/17/2020; FINAL ACTION: DROPPED/ABANDONED

    Read MoreRead Less