Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 06/01/2021 at 05:14:00 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. YOUNG, TAVARIS ANTRELL

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against YOUNG, TAVARIS ANTRELL. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCHWAB, CHARLES A and MIRMAN, LAWRENCE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********87 A

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCHWAB, CHARLES A

MIRMAN, LAWRENCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

YOUNG, TAVARIS ANTRELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEDGES, SARA

Defendant Attorney

HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA

 

Court Documents

CAPIAS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

5/25/2021: CAPIAS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

5/25/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

CAPIAS - SIGNED BY JUDGE ( V )

5/21/2021: CAPIAS - SIGNED BY JUDGE ( V )

RETURN MAIL ( V )

5/18/2021: RETURN MAIL ( V )

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

5/13/2021: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

5/3/2021: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

4/30/2021: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

4/30/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

4/30/2021: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

CAPIAS ISSUED: ISS FROM DIRECT INFO

4/27/2021: CAPIAS ISSUED: ISS FROM DIRECT INFO

INFORMATION ( V )

4/27/2021: INFORMATION ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

3/30/2021: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

3/31/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

3/30/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: MIRMAN, LAWRENCE; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount; Code: PDAPP; Description: Public Defender Application; Assessment: $50.00; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT HEARING; Judge: SCHWAB, CHARLES A; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCAPIAS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCASE UNSECURED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketARREST REPORT - NOT INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCAPIAS STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: SLCSO - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021CF000787 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. YOUNG, TAVARIS ANTRELL - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: CCSJ-5/21/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCAPIAS STATUS CHANGED TO PENDING SIGNATURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: HEDGES, SARA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCAPIAS ISSUED: ISS FROM DIRECT INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SCHWAB, CHARLES A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 03/30/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CF000787 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEDGES, SARA