Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 04/25/2021 at 04:15:00 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. YOUNG, JAZMIN MONIQUE

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against YOUNG, JAZMIN MONIQUE. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCHWAB, CHARLES A and MIRMAN, LAWRENCE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********59 A

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCHWAB, CHARLES A

MIRMAN, LAWRENCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

YOUNG, JAZMIN MONIQUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEDGES, SARA

Defendant Attorneys

HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA

DADAN BONNA, SASHA

MUSCA, JOHN PATRICK

METCALF, ANDREW BUREN

 

Court Documents

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

3/26/2021: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY; Judge: MIRMAN, LAWRENCE; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: METCALF, ANDREW BUREN; DADAN BONNA, SASHA; BARNETT, SARAH - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021CF000759 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. YOUNG, JAZMIN MONIQUE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-4/20/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketDOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY SET FOR 07/14/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 3A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: MIRMAN, LAWRENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: METCALF, ANDREW BUREN - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021CF000759 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. YOUNG, JAZMIN MONIQUE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: IF-4/19/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: HEDGES, SARA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketSURETY BOND AS50K106084 POSTED $50,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketSURETY BOND AS50K106083 POSTED $50,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SCHWAB, CHARLES A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 03/26/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CF000759 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MUSCA, JOHN PATRICK

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DADAN BONNA, SASHA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA