This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 01/22/2021 at 12:14:05 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. WYNKOOP, BRYNN LEONORE

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WYNKOOP, BRYNN LEONORE. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHWAB, CHARLES A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********13 B

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHWAB, CHARLES A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

WYNKOOP, BRYNN LEONORE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SWEET, LAUREN KATHERYN

Defendant Attorneys

LUGO, JEANETTE MARIE

HAUGEN, SHANNON

 

Court Documents

CERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4537.732 / 4803798) ( V )

1/13/2021: CERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4537.732 / 4803798) ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V )

12/21/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V )

COMMITMENT TO COUNTY JAIL ( V )

12/17/2020: COMMITMENT TO COUNTY JAIL ( V )

PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

12/14/2020: PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET ( V )

12/14/2020: SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

11/9/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

10/14/2020: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

9/22/2020: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

9/22/2020: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

9/17/2020: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

INFORMATION ( V )

9/17/2020: INFORMATION ( V )

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V ) ( V )

9/16/2020: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V ) ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V ) ( V )

9/10/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V ) ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V ) ( V )

9/8/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V ) ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V ) ( V )

9/8/2020: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V ) ( V )

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 3; Code: RAPE CRISIS; Description: Rape Crisis Trust Fund; Assessment: $151.09; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $151.09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 3; Code: PDFEES CF; Description: Public Defender Fees; Assessment: $100.06; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $100.06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 3; Code: PDAPP; Description: Public Defender Application; Assessment: $50.03; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $50.03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 3; Code: DRUG TRUST FUND CO; Description: County Drug Abuse Program; Assessment: $125.07; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $125.07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 3; Code: COP CF; Description: Cost of Prosecution; Assessment: $200.12; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $200.12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 3; Code: COI; Description: Cost of Investigation; Assessment: $50.03; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $50.03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 3; Code: CF COST; Description: CF Court Cost; Assessment: $418.25; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $418.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4537.732 / 4803798) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketAttorney LAUREN KATHERYN SWEET - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: SCHWAB, CHARLES A; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC; Result: CASE CONTINUED BY COURT PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: LUGO, JEANETTE MARIE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SCHWAB, CHARLES A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/08/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002125 A

    Read MoreRead Less