This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 04/11/2021 at 05:07:35 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. WRIGHT, MICHAEL LEE

Case Summary

On 02/10/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WRIGHT, MICHAEL LEE. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHWAB, CHARLES A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********70 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHWAB, CHARLES A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

WRIGHT, MICHAEL LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SWEET, LAUREN KATHERYN

Defendant Attorney

HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA

 

Court Documents

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

4/7/2021: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

3/12/2021: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

2/10/2021: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

3/11/2021: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

3/5/2021: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

3/5/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

INFORMATION ( V )

2/22/2021: INFORMATION ( V )

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

2/11/2021: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

2/11/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

ORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V )

2/10/2021: ORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

2/10/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: SCHWAB, CHARLES A; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT HEARING; Judge: SCHWAB, CHARLES A; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2021
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount; Code: PDAPP; Description: Public Defender Application; Assessment: $50.00; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketDOCKET CALL - PD SET FOR 05/11/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 3A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: SCHWAB, CHARLES A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - ADHZJOE

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketCITATION ADHZJOE FILED, OFFENSE DATE 02/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SCHWAB, CHARLES A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/10/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CF000370 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA