This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 03/03/2021 at 13:01:40 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. WOOLLEY, TROY HAROLD

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WOOLLEY, TROY HAROLD. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHWAB, CHARLES A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********58 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHWAB, CHARLES A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

WOOLLEY, TROY HAROLD OAKLEY

WOOLLEY, TROY HAROLD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SWEET, LAUREN KATHERYN

Defendant Attorney

HAUGEN, SHANNON

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

2/4/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

12/16/2020: RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

12/14/2020: RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

12/9/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

11/24/2020: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

11/13/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

11/12/2020: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - INSUFFICIENT INFORMATION ( V )

11/10/2020: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - INSUFFICIENT INFORMATION ( V )

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

11/10/2020: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

11/9/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

9/21/2020: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

9/23/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

INFORMATION ( V )

9/23/2020: INFORMATION ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

9/21/2020: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

9/21/2020: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: SCHWAB, CHARLES A; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: MEREUS, WILSON - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CF002258 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. WOOLLEY, TROY HAROLD - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-2/4/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketDOCKET CALL - PD SET FOR 04/06/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 3A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: SCHWAB, CHARLES A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: SCHWAB, CHARLES A; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC; Result: CASE CONTINUED BY DEFENSE MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES: DOCKET CALL: DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT IN OPEN COURT. APD S.HAUGEN AND ASA L.SWEET WAS PRESENT VIA ZOOM, DEFENSE MADE A MOTION TO CONTINUE. MOTION GRANTED. SPEEDY TRIAL WAIVED. CASE SET FOR DOCKET CALL ON 04/06/21 AT 9:00AM .KA/KD/DC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: MEREUS, WILSON - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CF002258 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. WOOLLEY, TROY HAROLD - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-12/9/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT HEARING SET FOR 11/09/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN 3A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: SCHWAB, CHARLES A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: SWEET, LAUREN KATHERYN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSC5900657 POSTED $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSC5900658 POSTED $5,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SCHWAB, CHARLES A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/21/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002258 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAUGEN, SHANNON