Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 04/20/2021 at 04:40:29 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. WILSON, SHEILA MARIE

Case Summary

On 03/23/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WILSON, SHEILA MARIE. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHWAB, CHARLES A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********34 A

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHWAB, CHARLES A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

WILSON, SHEILA MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEDGES, SARA

Defendant Attorneys

OHLE, MICHAEL ROBERT

HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA

MINTON, ASHLEY NICOLE

 

Court Documents

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

3/23/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

3/23/2021: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY; Judge: SCHWAB, CHARLES A; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: OHLE, MICHAEL ROBERT; MINTON, ASHLEY NICOLE - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021CF000734 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. WILSON, SHEILA MARIE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 2 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: IF-4/13/2021,NOCD-4/13/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY SET FOR 05/12/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 3A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: SCHWAB, CHARLES A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: HEDGES, SARA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: OHLE, MICHAEL ROBERT ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDEMAND FOR DISCOVERY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SCHWAB, CHARLES A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 03/23/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CF000734 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEDGES, SARA