Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 04/19/2021 at 03:13:04 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. WILLIAMS, ROSA LYNN

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WILLIAMS, ROSA LYNN. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NELSON, KATHRYN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********68 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    St. Lucie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NELSON, KATHRYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

WILLIAMS, ROSA LYNN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MITTLEMAN, DANIEL MARC

Defendant Attorney

MCDAVID, KURT ANDREW

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

4/15/2021: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

NO INFORMATION

4/15/2021: NO INFORMATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

4/13/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

4/13/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

4/12/2021: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

4/12/2021: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

4/12/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

4/9/2021: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT HEARING; Judge: NELSON, KATHRYN; Location: Courtroom 2C - HC; Result: NO INFORMATION OF CASE PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT JAIL; Judge: NELSON, KATHRYN; Location: Courtroom 2C - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 1; Description: BATTERY (784.03.1A1); Level: M; Degree: F; Disposition: Dropped / Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: FREDERIQUE, JAMES - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021MM000668 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. WILLIAMS, ROSA LYNN - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: CDB-4/15/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketSURETY BOND 00610658782 (784.03.1A1) RELEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: MITTLEMAN, DANIEL MARC ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO INFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: MCDAVID, KURT ANDREW ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT HEARING SET FOR 05/18/2021 AT 9:30 AM IN 2C/ , COUNTY JUDGE: NELSON, KATHRYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketSURETY BOND 00610658782 POSTED $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT JAIL SET FOR 04/21/2021 AT 9:30 AM IN 2C/ , COUNTY JUDGE: NELSON, KATHRYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE NELSON, KATHRYN: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 04/09/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021MM000668 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant