This case was last updated from St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/29/2023 at 12:09:16 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. WILLIAMS, RICHARD C

Case Summary

On 12/29/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WILLIAMS, RICHARD C. This case was filed in St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MIRMAN, LAWRENCE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********81 A

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MIRMAN, LAWRENCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

WILLIAMS, RICHARD C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REID, KATY ELIZABETH

Defendant Attorney

TUFTE, KAREN JEAN

 

Court Documents

WARRANT FILED

12/29/2022: WARRANT FILED

COMPLAINT / SWORN COMPLAINT

12/29/2022: COMPLAINT / SWORN COMPLAINT

ARREST REPORT - NOT INITIATING CASE

1/3/2023: ARREST REPORT - NOT INITIATING CASE

NOTICE ON DEMAND

1/3/2023: NOTICE ON DEMAND

BOND RECEIVED

1/3/2023: BOND RECEIVED

WARRANT RETURNED SERVED

1/3/2023: WARRANT RETURNED SERVED

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION

1/3/2023: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

1/11/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

1/11/2023: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

INFORMATION

1/23/2023: INFORMATION

RETURN MAIL

2/9/2023: RETURN MAIL

COURT MINUTES

2/20/2023: COURT MINUTES

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

2/21/2023: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

RETURN MAIL

3/13/2023: RETURN MAIL

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2023
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY; Judge: MIRMAN, LAWRENCE; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: TUFTE, KAREN JEAN; RICHARDSON, CALVIN - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022CF003381 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. WILLIAMS, RICHARD C - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-2/21/2023"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY SET FOR 04/12/2023 AT 9:00 AM IN 3A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: MIRMAN, LAWRENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT HEARING; Judge: MIRMAN, LAWRENCE; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC; Result: CASE HEARD / NEW COURT DATE SET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: RICHARDSON, CALVIN - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022CF003381 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. WILLIAMS, RICHARD C - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-1/23/2023"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: TUFTE, KAREN JEAN - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022CF003381 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. WILLIAMS, RICHARD C - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 2 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-1/23/2023,IF-1/23/2023"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2022
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWARRANT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketWARRANT NUMBER: 20221200716

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketARREST WARRANT BOND AMOUNT SET TO $6000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SENT TO SHERIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketCASE SECURED FOR ACTIVE PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketARREST WARRANT ISSUED: WARRANT OF ARREST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE MIRMAN, LAWRENCE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT / SWORN COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/29/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022CF003381 A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less