Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 18:23:22 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. WHITE, JUSTIN TYRONE

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WHITE, JUSTIN TYRONE. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NELSON, KATHRYN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********94 A

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    St. Lucie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NELSON, KATHRYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

WHITE, JUSTIN TYRONE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOLLOMAN, FELICIA

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TERMINATE PROBATION ( V )

8/1/2017: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TERMINATE PROBATION ( V )

ORDER OF PROBATION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.3987.1918 / 4300626) ( V )

4/24/2017: ORDER OF PROBATION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.3987.1918 / 4300626) ( V )

ORDER OF PROBATION ( V )

4/19/2017: ORDER OF PROBATION ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

3/30/2017: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

3/29/2017: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

INFORMATION ( V )

3/13/2017: INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

3/8/2017: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

3/6/2017: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

3/6/2017: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2017
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2017000059080; Applied Amount; $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • DocketPAYMENT $150.00 RECEIPT #2017000059080 RECEIVED FOR ACCOUNT NUMBER 2017MM000594 A VIA CORE080417.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TERMINATE PROBATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2017000051689; Applied Amount; $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • DocketPAYMENT $150.00 RECEIPT #2017000051689 RECEIVED FOR ACCOUNT NUMBER 2017MM000594 A VIA CORE070717.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2017000035412; Applied Amount; $148.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketPAYMENT $148.00 RECEIPT #2017000035412 RECEIVED FOR ACCOUNT NUMBER 2017MM000594 A VIA CORE050517.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2017
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: DRUG TRUST FUND CO; Description: County Drug Abuse Program; Assessment: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: COP MM; Description: Cost of Prosecution; Assessment: $50.00; Paid: $50.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: COI; Description: Cost of Investigation; Assessment: $25.00; Paid: $25.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT HEARING SET FOR 03/29/2017 AT 9:00 AM IN 2C/ , COUNTY JUDGE: NELSON, KATHRYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT JAIL SET FOR 03/24/2017 AT 9:00 AM IN 2C/ , COUNTY JUDGE: NELSON, KATHRYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • DocketSURETY BOND AA17406661 POSTED $750.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE NELSON, KATHRYN: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 03/03/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017MM000594 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOLLOMAN, FELICIA