This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 01/22/2021 at 12:18:00 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. WEST, DERRY LAWERENCE

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WEST, DERRY LAWERENCE. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHWAB, CHARLES A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********31 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHWAB, CHARLES A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

WEST, DERRY LAWERENCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CORMIER, JUSTIN

Defendant Attorneys

LUGO, JEANETTE MARIE

HAUGEN, SHANNON

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

1/11/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

1/11/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

11/9/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

10/22/2020: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

10/9/2020: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

10/9/2020: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

TRANSFER CASE LETTER

10/8/2020: TRANSFER CASE LETTER

INFORMATION ( V )

10/6/2020: INFORMATION ( V )

NO INFORMATION ( V ) ( V )

10/5/2020: NO INFORMATION ( V ) ( V )

NO INFORMATION ( V )

10/5/2020: NO INFORMATION ( V )

SEARCH WARRANT AND INVENTORY ( V ) ( V )

9/25/2020: SEARCH WARRANT AND INVENTORY ( V ) ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V ) ( V )

9/22/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V ) ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V ) ( V )

9/22/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V ) ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V ) ( V )

9/21/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V ) ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V ) ( V )

9/21/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V ) ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V ) ( V )

9/18/2020: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V ) ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

9/21/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

9/18/2020: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: SCHWAB, CHARLES A; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: HILBURN, PATRICK - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CF002231 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. WEST, DERRY LAWERENCE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-1/11/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketSURETY BOND AS51371008 POSTED $2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketSURETY BOND AS51371010 POSTED $2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketSURETY BOND AS15569724 POSTED $15,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketSURETY BOND AS51371009 POSTED $2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SCHWAB, CHARLES A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/18/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002231 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/18/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002234 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/18/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002233 A

    Read MoreRead Less