This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/23/2020 at 04:11:54 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. WEST, DERRY LAWERENCE

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WEST, DERRY LAWERENCE. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHWAB, CHARLES A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********34 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHWAB, CHARLES A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

WEST, DERRY LAWERENCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CORMIER, JUSTIN

Defendant Attorney

LUGO, JEANETTE MARIE

 

Court Documents

TRANSFER CASE LETTER

10/8/2020: TRANSFER CASE LETTER

INFORMATION ( V )

10/6/2020: INFORMATION ( V )

NO INFORMATION ( V )

10/5/2020: NO INFORMATION ( V )

SEARCH WARRANT AND INVENTORY ( V )

9/25/2020: SEARCH WARRANT AND INVENTORY ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

9/22/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

9/21/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

9/18/2020: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketCONSOLIDATED TO 2020CF002231 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 3; Description: UNLAWFUL USE OF TWO-WAY COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE (934.215); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: Consolidated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 2; Description: SYNTH NARCOTIC-POSSESS * WIT SELL MFG OR DELIVER SCHEDULE I OR II (893.13.1A1); Level: F; Degree: S; Disposition: Consolidated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 1; Description: SALE OF HYDROMORPHONE (893.13.1A1); Level: F; Degree: S; Disposition: Dropped / Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: CORMIER, JUSTIN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO INFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSEARCH WARRANT AND INVENTORY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: LUGO, JEANETTE MARIE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SCHWAB, CHARLES A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/18/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002234 A

    Read MoreRead Less