Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 06/06/2020 at 06:13:38 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. WEEKES, EMMANUEL JEROME

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WEEKES, EMMANUEL JEROME. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NELSON, KATHRYN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********85 A

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    St. Lucie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NELSON, KATHRYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

WEEKES, EMMANUEL JEROME

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAKU, STEVEN RUSSELL

Defendant Attorneys

HAUGEN, SHANNON

NASH, AISHA A

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FINES AND COST DUE

4/22/2020: NOTICE OF FINES AND COST DUE

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

4/22/2020: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

RETURN MAIL

4/21/2020: RETURN MAIL

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

4/9/2020: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED

4/7/2020: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED

VIOL OF PROBATION WARRANT RETURNED SERVED

4/7/2020: VIOL OF PROBATION WARRANT RETURNED SERVED

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD

4/7/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD

AFFIDAVIT OF VIOLATION OF PROBATION ( V )

2/3/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF VIOLATION OF PROBATION ( V )

VIOLATION OF PROBATION WARRANT ( V )

2/3/2020: VIOLATION OF PROBATION WARRANT ( V )

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4375.1907 / 4667910) ( V )

1/29/2020: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4375.1907 / 4667910) ( V )

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

1/24/2020: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

1/15/2020: PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

12/19/2019: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

INFORMATION ( V )

12/16/2019: INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

12/4/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

12/3/2019: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

12/2/2019: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

12/2/2019: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketAttorney STEVEN RUSSELL PAKU - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketAttorney AISHA A NASH - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 2; Code: COP MM; Description: Cost of Prosecution; Assessment: $100.00; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 2; Code: PDFEES MM; Description: Public Defender Fees; Assessment: $50.00; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 2; Code: PDAPP; Description: Public Defender Application; Assessment: $50.00; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT JAIL; Judge: NELSON, KATHRYN; Location: Courtroom 2C - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • HearingEvent: JAIL DOCKET; Judge: NELSON, KATHRYN; Location: Courtroom 2C - HC; Result: SENTENCE IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketREOPENED CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINES AND COST DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketIN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: HAUGEN, SHANNON ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT JAIL SET FOR 12/19/2019 AT 1:30 PM IN 2C/ , COUNTY JUDGE: NELSON, KATHRYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE NELSON, KATHRYN: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/02/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019MM002785 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAKU, STEVEN RUSSELL