This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/23/2020 at 04:08:58 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. WARREN, CHRISTOPHER JAMES

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WARREN, CHRISTOPHER JAMES. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELANGER, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********48 B

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELANGER, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

WARREN, CHRISTOPHER JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BALDREE, LINDA KAY

Defendant Attorney

ZARAGOZA, MATIAS JORDI

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

10/7/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

10/7/2020: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

10/7/2020: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

10/7/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ( V )

10/7/2020: ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ( V )

ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ( V )

10/7/2020: ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ( V )

MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

9/21/2020: MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

INFORMATION ( V )

9/17/2020: INFORMATION ( V )

ORDER APPT COUNSEL/CONFLICT COUNSEL/REGIONAL COUNSEL ( V ) ( V )

9/14/2020: ORDER APPT COUNSEL/CONFLICT COUNSEL/REGIONAL COUNSEL ( V ) ( V )

MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

8/25/2020: MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

8/20/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

8/17/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY; Judge: BELANGER, ROBERT E; Location: Courtroom 3B - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT HEARING; Judge: BELANGER, ROBERT E; Location: Courtroom 3B - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: ZARAGOZA, MATIAS JORDI - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CF001948 B, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. WARREN, CHRISTOPHER JAMES - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-10/7/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketDOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY SET FOR 12/09/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN 3B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BELANGER, ROBERT E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: ZARAGOZA, MATIAS JORDI ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: OFFICE OF CRIMINAL CONFLICT AND CIVIL REGIONAL COUNSEL ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPT COUNSEL/CONFLICT COUNSEL/REGIONAL COUNSEL ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: LEWIS, DAVID ALEXANDER ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SCHWAB, CHARLES A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 08/17/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF001950 A

    Read MoreRead Less