Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 04/15/2021 at 02:23:05 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. WARE, BRAD TWANN

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WARE, BRAD TWANN. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NELSON, KATHRYN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********67 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    St. Lucie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NELSON, KATHRYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

WARE, BRAD TWANN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

4/13/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

4/12/2021: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

4/12/2021: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

4/12/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT HEARING; Judge: NELSON, KATHRYN; Location: Courtroom 2C - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT JAIL; Judge: NELSON, KATHRYN; Location: Courtroom 2C - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: MEREUS, WILSON - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021MM000667 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. WARE, BRAD TWANN - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-4/13/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT HEARING SET FOR 05/18/2021 AT 9:30 AM IN 2C/ , COUNTY JUDGE: NELSON, KATHRYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSC51536359 POSTED $3,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT JAIL SET FOR 04/21/2021 AT 9:30 AM IN 2C/ , COUNTY JUDGE: NELSON, KATHRYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE NELSON, KATHRYN: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 04/09/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021MM000667 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant