This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/26/2020 at 08:42:26 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. WALKER, ERICH DORELL JR

Case Summary

On 06/07/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WALKER, ERICH DORELL JR. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LEVIN, STEVEN J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********42 A

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LEVIN, STEVEN J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

WALKER, ERICH DORELL JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COHEN, ALISSA R

Defendant Attorney

COUZENS, STEVEN EDWARD

 

Court Documents

INFORMATION AMENDED ( V )

7/9/2018: INFORMATION AMENDED ( V )

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

6/21/2018: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

6/20/2018: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V )

6/20/2018: FIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V )

CAPIAS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

6/20/2018: CAPIAS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

6/20/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

6/19/2018: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

6/19/2018: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

CAPIAS - SIGNED BY JUDGE ( V )

6/18/2018: CAPIAS - SIGNED BY JUDGE ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

6/15/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

CAPIAS ISSUED: ISS FROM DIRECT INFO

6/14/2018: CAPIAS ISSUED: ISS FROM DIRECT INFO

NONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

6/7/2018: NONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

6/7/2018: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V )

6/7/2018: FIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V )

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2018
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: LEVIN, STEVEN J; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT HEARING; Judge: LEVIN, STEVEN J; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • HearingEvent: BOND HEARING; Judge: LEVIN, STEVEN J; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketCONSOLIDATED TO 2018CF001537 B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketCLERK NOTE: PUBLIC DEFENDER APPLICATION FEE HAS BEEN TRANSFERRED TO 2018CF1537B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketPURSUANT TO RULE 2.430, COURT RECORD FILE HAS BEEN DESTROYED OR DISPOSED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: COHEN, ALISSA R ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 4; Description: ORGANIZED FRAUD-LESS THAN $20,000 (817.034.4A3); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: Consolidated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 3; Description: RESISTING OFFICER WITHOUT VIOLENCE (843.02); Level: M; Degree: F; Disposition: Consolidated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 2; Description: POSSESSION OF 20 GRAMS OR LESS OF CANNABIS (893.13.6B); Level: M; Degree: F; Disposition: Consolidated

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketCAPIAS STATUS CHANGED TO PENDING SIGNATURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCAPIAS ISSUED: ISS FROM DIRECT INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE LEVIN, STEVEN J: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCASE FILED 06/07/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018CF001542 A

    Read MoreRead Less