Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 18:16:14 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. VAN LEUVEN, JOSHUA RODNEY

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against VAN LEUVEN, JOSHUA RODNEY. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are METZGER, ELIZABETH A, NELSON, KATHRYN and COX, CYNTHIA L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********82 A

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    St. Lucie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

NELSON, KATHRYN

COX, CYNTHIA L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

VAN LEUVEN, JOSHUA RODNEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DODD, DAVID

Defendant Attorneys

ALONZO, KATHARINE ANNE

LEWIS, DAVID ALEXANDER

HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA

 

Court Documents

ORDER ALLOWING DEFENDANT TO WITHDRAW PLEA AND DISMISSING CHARGES ( V )

12/18/2017: ORDER ALLOWING DEFENDANT TO WITHDRAW PLEA AND DISMISSING CHARGES ( V )

ORDER TO LIFE / MODIFY NO CONTACT ORDER (MENTAL HEALTH COURT CONDITIONS) ( V )

6/1/2017: ORDER TO LIFE / MODIFY NO CONTACT ORDER (MENTAL HEALTH COURT CONDITIONS) ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

5/5/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

4/20/2017: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

4/20/2017: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

ORDER FOR DRUG SCREENING ST LUCIE DRUG LAB ( V )

4/17/2017: ORDER FOR DRUG SCREENING ST LUCIE DRUG LAB ( V )

ORDER PLACING DEFENDANT INTO MENTAL HEALTH COURT ( V )

4/17/2017: ORDER PLACING DEFENDANT INTO MENTAL HEALTH COURT ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

3/29/2017: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

ORDER ( V )

3/24/2017: ORDER ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

3/23/2017: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

3/23/2017: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

3/22/2017: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

3/9/2017: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

2/15/2017: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

2/13/2017: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

2/10/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

2/8/2017: NONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT ( V )

2/8/2017: FIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT ( V )

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketREMOVED PUBLIC DEFENDER FEE PER F.S. 939.06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • HearingEvent: MENTAL HEALTH COURT; Judge: METZGER, ELIZABETH A; Location: Courtroom 1D - HC; Result: PLEA WITHDRAWN CHARGES DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 2; Description: CRIMINAL MISCHIEF-$200 OR LESS (806.13.1A); Level: M; Degree: S; Disposition: DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 1; Description: BATTERY (784.03.1A1); Level: M; Degree: F; Disposition: DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ALLOWING DEFENDANT TO WITHDRAW PLEA AND DISMISSING CHARGES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketREOPENED CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES: MENTAL HEALTH COURT- GRADUATION- DEFENDANT APPEARED IN OPEN COURT. THE DEFENDANT HAS SUCCESSFULLY COMPLETED MENTAL HEALTH COURT. CASE HAS BEEN DISMISSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketMENTAL HEALTH COURT SET FOR 12/18/2017 AT 2:30 PM IN 1D/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: COX, CYNTHIA L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • HearingEvent: MENTAL HEALTH COURT; Judge: COX, CYNTHIA L; Location: Courtroom 1D - HC; Result: CASE HEARD / NEW COURT DATE SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES: MENTAL HEALTH COURT: DEFENDANT APPEARED IN OPEN COURT ON THE 'A' TEAM. CASE SET FOR ADDITIONAL REVIEW ON 12/18/2017 AT 2:30 PM. AP/DB/DC

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: LEWIS, DAVID ALEXANDER ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE LEVIN, STEVEN J: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/08/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017CF000336 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALONZO, KATHARINE ANNE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEWIS, DAVID ALEXANDER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA