This case was last updated from St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/13/2023 at 13:16:21 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. TOMLINSON, DALTON LUCAS

Case Summary

On 08/05/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against TOMLINSON, DALTON LUCAS. This case was filed in St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MIRMAN, LAWRENCE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********52 A

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MIRMAN, LAWRENCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

TOMLINSON, DALTON LUCAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REID, KATY ELIZABETH

Defendant Attorney

SHAFER, THEODORE CHARLES

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

12/6/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL

12/6/2022: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL

MOTION TO COMPEL

12/5/2022: MOTION TO COMPEL

COURT MINUTES

12/1/2022: COURT MINUTES

ORDER TO DETERMINE MENTAL CONDITION

10/24/2022: ORDER TO DETERMINE MENTAL CONDITION

MOTION TO DETERMINE COMPETENCY

10/21/2022: MOTION TO DETERMINE COMPETENCY

NOTICE

10/20/2022: NOTICE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

10/18/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

MOTION TO CONTINUE

10/17/2022: MOTION TO CONTINUE

ORDER TO CONTINUE

10/17/2022: ORDER TO CONTINUE

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

10/7/2022: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

9/14/2022: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

9/12/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

8/31/2022: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

8/31/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NO INFORMATION

8/30/2022: NO INFORMATION

INFORMATION

8/30/2022: INFORMATION

WARRANT RETURNED SERVED

8/11/2022: WARRANT RETURNED SERVED

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2023
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY; Judge: MIRMAN, LAWRENCE; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketPSYCHOLOGICAL EVALUATION SEALED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: SHAFER, THEODORE CHARLES; HILBURN, PATRICK - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022CF001952 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. TOMLINSON, DALTON LUCAS - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-12/6/2022"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketDOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY SET FOR 01/18/2023 AT 9:00 AM IN 3A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: MIRMAN, LAWRENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY; Judge: MIRMAN, LAWRENCE; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC; Result: CASE CONTINUED BY DEFENSE MOTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: MIRMAN, LAWRENCE; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT / SWORN COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWARRANT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketWARRANT NUMBER: 202217351

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketARREST WARRANT BOND AMOUNT SET TO $45000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SENT TO SHERIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketCASE SECURED FOR ACTIVE PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketARREST WARRANT ISSUED: WARRANT OF ARREST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE MIRMAN, LAWRENCE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 08/05/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022CF001952 A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less