This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/25/2020 at 17:57:43 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. TODD, KAYLA KORINN

Case Summary

On 04/09/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against TODD, KAYLA KORINN. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCHWAB, CHARLES A and LEVIN, STEVEN J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********06 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCHWAB, CHARLES A

LEVIN, STEVEN J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

TODD, KAYLA KORINN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SWEET, LAUREN KATHERYN

LINN, MICHAEL JAMES

Defendant Attorney

MOSHER, EDWARD JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

1/22/2020: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ( V )

8/26/2019: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

8/12/2019: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

RETURN MAIL ( V )

7/22/2019: RETURN MAIL ( V )

RETURN MAIL ( V )

4/1/2019: RETURN MAIL ( V )

RETURN MAIL ( V )

2/25/2019: RETURN MAIL ( V )

RETURN MAIL ( V )

12/27/2018: RETURN MAIL ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

12/13/2018: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

MOTION TO CONTINUE FILED ( V )

10/16/2018: MOTION TO CONTINUE FILED ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

9/13/2018: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

ORDER TO CONTINUE ( V )

9/13/2018: ORDER TO CONTINUE ( V )

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

5/9/2018: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE ( V )

4/24/2018: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

4/24/2018: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

4/24/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

4/17/2018: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

4/17/2018: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

4/9/2018: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • HearingEvent: SENTENCING HEARING; Judge: SCHWAB, CHARLES A; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • HearingEvent: SENTENCING HEARING; Judge: SCHWAB, CHARLES A; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC; Result: CASE HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 1; Description: POSSESSION OF OXYCODONE (893.13.6A); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: Nolle Prosequi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketSURETY BOND AC00964229 (893.13.6A-16) RELEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES: SENTENCING HEARING: DEFENDANT WAS PRESENT IN OPEN COURT WITH ATTY E. MOSHER. ASA L. SWEET WAS PRESENT. DEFENSE MADE A MOTION TO WITHDRAW PLEA. STATE HAS NO OBJECTION. MOTION GRANTED. STATE TO ENTER A NOLLE PROSEQUI OF THE CASE. KD/DB/DC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketSENTENCING HEARING SET FOR 08/29/2019 AT 9:00 AM IN 3A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: SCHWAB, CHARLES A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT HEARING SET FOR 05/03/2018 AT 9:15 AM IN 3A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: LEVIN, STEVEN J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: LINN, MICHAEL JAMES ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketSURETY BOND AC00964229 POSTED $15,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE LEVIN, STEVEN J: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketCASE FILED 04/09/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018CF000906 A

    Read MoreRead Less