This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/26/2020 at 18:14:47 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. TAMAYO DIAZ, YULEIDYS CARMEN

Case Summary

On 07/13/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against TAMAYO DIAZ, YULEIDYS CARMEN. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LEVIN, STEVEN J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********91 A

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LEVIN, STEVEN J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

TAMAYO DIAZ, YULEIDYS CARMEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CORMIER, JUSTIN

Defendant Attorney

COUZENS, STEVEN EDWARD

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

8/27/2018: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

NO INFORMATION ( V )

8/20/2018: NO INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

7/20/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

7/17/2018: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

7/16/2018: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

7/16/2018: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

7/16/2018: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

NONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

7/13/2018: NONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V )

7/13/2018: FIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 1; Description: UTTERING FORGED INSTRUMENT (831.02); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: Dropped / Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: CORMIER, JUSTIN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSC5472023 (831.02-4) RELEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketREMOVED PUBLIC DEFENDER FEE PER F.S. 939.06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO INFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: COUZENS, STEVEN EDWARD ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSC5472023 POSTED $5,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE LEVIN, STEVEN J: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketCASE FILED 07/13/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018CF001891 A

    Read MoreRead Less