This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/25/2020 at 12:02:05 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. STAPLETON, WARREN ROGER

Case Summary

On 03/16/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against STAPLETON, WARREN ROGER. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCHWAB, CHARLES A and LEVIN, STEVEN J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********28 A

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCHWAB, CHARLES A

LEVIN, STEVEN J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

STAPLETON, WARREN ROGER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BALDREE, LINDA KAY

Defendant Attorneys

HOLBERTON, JESSICA JEAN

KELLY, REBECCA

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

2/11/2019: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

1/28/2019: MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

12/21/2018: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V )

10/24/2018: FIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V )

BOND RECEIVED-TELETYPE ( V )

10/12/2018: BOND RECEIVED-TELETYPE ( V )

VIOLATION OF PROBATION REPORT ( V )

9/24/2018: VIOLATION OF PROBATION REPORT ( V )

ORDER OF PROBATION(CORRECTED) ( V )

8/13/2018: ORDER OF PROBATION(CORRECTED) ( V )

ORDER OF PROBATION ( V )

6/18/2018: ORDER OF PROBATION ( V )

IN-COURT NOTES

6/11/2018: IN-COURT NOTES

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

4/3/2018: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

IN-COURT NOTES

4/2/2018: IN-COURT NOTES

ORDER TO RELEASE DEFENDANT ( V )

4/2/2018: ORDER TO RELEASE DEFENDANT ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

3/28/2018: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

NO INFORMATION FILED ( V )

3/16/2018: NO INFORMATION FILED ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

3/16/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

COURT MINUTES ( V )

3/16/2018: COURT MINUTES ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

3/16/2018: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

ORDER TO TRANSFER ( V )

3/16/2018: ORDER TO TRANSFER ( V )

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000058501; Applied Amount; $120.19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $120.19 RECEIPT #2019000058501

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000050654; Applied Amount; $144.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $144.23 RECEIPT #2019000050654

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketSURETY BOND 2018BB016796 (893.13.6A-15) RELEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • HearingEvent: VOP DOCKET HEARING; Judge: SCHWAB, CHARLES A; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC; Result: NOLLE PROSEQUI OF CASE PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketREOPENED CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DISMISSING WARRANT (VIOLATION OF PROBATION) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
102 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )- INDIAN RIVER COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO TRANSFER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE LEVIN, STEVEN J: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketCASE FILED 03/16/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018CF000728 A

    Read MoreRead Less