This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 04/17/2021 at 03:46:33 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. SPARKMAN, LARENZ SHYHEIM

Case Summary

On 10/06/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SPARKMAN, LARENZ SHYHEIM. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NELSON, KATHRYN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********28 A

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NELSON, KATHRYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SPARKMAN, LARENZ SHYHEIM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FARACH, MANUEL

MITTLEMAN, DANIEL MARC

Defendant Attorneys

DIAZ, WENDY LEE

NASH, AISHA A

NELSON, JENNIFER A

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF PROBATION - Recorded (Other.4570.220 / 4830734) ( V )

3/12/2021: ORDER OF PROBATION - Recorded (Other.4570.220 / 4830734) ( V )

ORDER OF PROBATION ( V )

3/11/2021: ORDER OF PROBATION ( V )

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4558.1192 / 4820975) ( V )

2/18/2021: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4558.1192 / 4820975) ( V )

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

2/17/2021: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

1/29/2021: PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

1/27/2021: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

1/4/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

12/16/2020: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

12/2/2020: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

11/18/2020: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

11/13/2020: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

11/9/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

10/30/2020: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

10/30/2020: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

INFORMATION ( V )

10/27/2020: INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

10/9/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

10/6/2020: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

10/6/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF PROBATION - Recorded (Other.4570.220 / 4830734) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF PROBATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: PDFEES MM; Description: Public Defender Fees; Assessment: $50.00; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: COI; Description: Cost of Investigation; Assessment: $25.00; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: COP MM; Description: Cost of Prosecution; Assessment: $100.00; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: DOMVIO CHARGE; Description: Domestic Violence Surcharge; Assessment: $201.00; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $201.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: RAPE CRISIS; Description: Rape Crisis Trust Fund; Assessment: $151.00; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $151.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: MM COST; Description: MM Court Cost; Assessment: $223.00; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $223.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketAttorney DANIEL MARC MITTLEMAN - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4558.1192 / 4820975) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: FARACH, MANUEL ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: DIAZ, WENDY LEE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT JAIL SET FOR 10/30/2020 AT 9:30 AM IN 2C/ , COUNTY JUDGE: NELSON, KATHRYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE NELSON, KATHRYN: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 10/06/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020MM001928 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FARACH, MANUEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MITTLEMAN, DANIEL MARC