This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 04/11/2021 at 05:25:30 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. SINGLETARY, CURTIS HOWARD

Case Summary

On 02/11/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SINGLETARY, CURTIS HOWARD. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHWAB, CHARLES A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********81 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHWAB, CHARLES A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SINGLETARY, CURTIS HOWARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA

 

Court Documents

ORDER DISMISSING WARRANT ( V )

2/25/2021: ORDER DISMISSING WARRANT ( V )

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

2/19/2021: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

2/18/2021: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

WAIVER ( V )

2/12/2021: WAIVER ( V )

ORDER ( V )

2/12/2021: ORDER ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

2/11/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

2/11/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2021
  • DocketAttorney TIFFANY ANNA HOGAN - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DISMISSING WARRANT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 1; Description: OUT-OF-STATE-FUG (941.02); Level: N; Degree: N; Disposition: DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SCHWAB, CHARLES A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/11/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CF000381 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA