Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 04/20/2021 at 03:31:32 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. SINGER, BRITTANY ELIZABETH

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SINGER, BRITTANY ELIZABETH. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCHWAB, CHARLES A and MIRMAN, LAWRENCE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********76 A

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCHWAB, CHARLES A

MIRMAN, LAWRENCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SINGER, BRITTANY ELIZABETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CORMIER, JUSTIN

Defendant Attorney

HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

4/15/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

4/8/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

4/8/2021: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

INFORMATION ( V )

4/1/2021: INFORMATION ( V )

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

3/31/2021: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

3/31/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

3/29/2021: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

3/29/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: MIRMAN, LAWRENCE; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: SCHWAB, CHARLES A; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC; Result: CASE CONTINUED BY COURT PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT HEARING; Judge: SCHWAB, CHARLES A; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketDOCKET CALL - PD SET FOR 07/13/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 3A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: MIRMAN, LAWRENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDOCKET CALL - PD SET FOR 07/06/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 3A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: SCHWAB, CHARLES A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AEJTXZE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT HEARING SET FOR 05/10/2021 AT 10:30 AM IN 3A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: SCHWAB, CHARLES A

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCITATION AEJTXZE FILED, OFFENSE DATE 03/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SCHWAB, CHARLES A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 03/29/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CF000776 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA