This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/15/2023 at 22:05:49 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. SIMMONS, WILLIE FRANK

Case Summary

On 07/07/2009 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SIMMONS, WILLIE FRANK. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NELSON, KATHRYN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********27 A

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NELSON, KATHRYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SIMMONS, WILLIE FRANK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/07/2009

DocketCASE CLOSED FOR CONSOLIDATION, SEE 2009MM002624-B.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2009

DocketNOTICE OF COURT SENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2009

HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT HEARING; Judge: NELSON, KATHRYN; Location: Courtroom A - HC; Result: CONTINUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2009

DocketCASE CONT PER JUDGE TO 09/16/2009 9:00:00 AM REC CARD DEFT. TO HIRE ATTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2009

DocketNOT GUILTY PLEA ENTERED DEFT PRES/SA PRES PLEA NG

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2009

ChargeCharges: Count: 1; Description: LOITERING (856.021); Level: M; Degree: S; Disposition: Consolidated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2009

DocketINFORMATION FILED FOR CASE CONSOLIDATION CASE CONSOLIDATED WITH CO DEFT: BRITTNEY L DAVIS 09MM2624A1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2009

DocketNON-COURT: VERDICT: TRANS-ANOTHER CASE-CONSOLIDATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2009

DocketARREST AFFIDAVIT FILED. NOTICE ON DEMAND BOND ISSUED #U1-20207338 $250 VINCE GASKIN BB NOTICE OF COURT SENT BNDS, DEFT 8/4/09 9AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2009

DocketIMPORTED FROM WAREHOUSE DATA ALTERNATE CHARGE FOUND - 856.021( )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less