This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/14/2021 at 12:17:58 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. SIMMONS, NELSON JOSEPH

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SIMMONS, NELSON JOSEPH. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BELANGER, ROBERT E and SCHWAB, CHARLES A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********97 B

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BELANGER, ROBERT E

SCHWAB, CHARLES A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SIMMONS, NELSON JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIBBY, JONATHON

Defendant Attorneys

KELLY, REBECCA

HIXSON, JENNIFER ANN

MINTON, ASHLEY NICOLE

 

Court Documents

RETURN MAIL ( V )

10/19/2020: RETURN MAIL ( V )

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

10/12/2020: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

IN-COURT NOTES

10/5/2020: IN-COURT NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

9/30/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

10/1/2020: MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

9/25/2020: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

9/25/2020: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

ORDER APPT COUNSEL/CONFLICT COUNSEL/REGIONAL COUNSEL ( V )

8/26/2020: ORDER APPT COUNSEL/CONFLICT COUNSEL/REGIONAL COUNSEL ( V )

INFORMATION ( V )

9/17/2020: INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V ) ( V )

9/16/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V ) ( V )

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V ) ( V )

9/16/2020: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V ) ( V )

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V ) ( V )

9/16/2020: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V ) ( V )

MOTION FOR RELEASE ON RECOGNIZANCE (ROR) ( V ) ( V )

9/16/2020: MOTION FOR RELEASE ON RECOGNIZANCE (ROR) ( V ) ( V )

LETTER ( V )

8/26/2020: LETTER ( V )

MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

8/24/2020: MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

ORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V )

8/14/2020: ORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

8/14/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

8/13/2020: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY; Judge: BELANGER, ROBERT E; Location: Courtroom 3B - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketRETURN MAIL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY; Judge: BELANGER, ROBERT E; Location: Courtroom 3B - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (AMENDED) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: MINTON, ASHLEY NICOLE - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CF001897 B, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. SIMMONS, NELSON JOSEPH - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-2/8/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY SET FOR 03/10/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 3B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BELANGER, ROBERT E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketORDER TO CONTINUE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO CONTINUE FILED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (AMENDED) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPT COUNSEL/CONFLICT COUNSEL/REGIONAL COUNSEL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: KELLY, REBECCA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SCHWAB, CHARLES A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 08/13/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF001900 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HIXSON, JENNIFER ANN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MINTON, ASHLEY NICOLE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KELLY, REBECCA