This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 01/16/2021 at 12:53:01 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. SHELEY, ERIC ANDREW

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SHELEY, ERIC ANDREW. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHWAB, CHARLES A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********30 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHWAB, CHARLES A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SHELEY, ERIC ANDREW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SWEET, LAUREN KATHERYN

Defendant Attorney

HAUGEN, SHANNON

 

Court Documents

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

12/18/2020: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

12/3/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

IN-COURT NOTES

11/9/2020: IN-COURT NOTES

TRANSFER CASE LETTER

10/1/2020: TRANSFER CASE LETTER

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

9/30/2020: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

INFORMATION ( V )

9/30/2020: INFORMATION ( V )

INFORMATION ( V ) ( V )

9/25/2020: INFORMATION ( V ) ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V ) ( V )

9/21/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V ) ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

9/21/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: SCHWAB, CHARLES A; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketDOCKET CALL - PD SET FOR 03/02/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 3A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: SCHWAB, CHARLES A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: SCHWAB, CHARLES A; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC; Result: CASE CONTINUED BY DEFENSE MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES: DOCKET CALL- DEFENDANT DID NOT APPEAR IN COURT (IN CUSTODY). APD S HAUGEN AND ASA LSWEET APPEARED THRU ZOOM. DEFENSE MOTION TO CONTINUE WAS GRANTED. CASE SET FOR DOCKET CALL ON 03/02/2021 AT 9:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketDOCKET CALL - PD SET FOR 01/05/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 3A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: SCHWAB, CHARLES A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: SCHWAB, CHARLES A; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC; Result: CASE CONTINUED BY DEFENSE MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketSPEEDY TRIAL WAIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES: DOCKET CALL: DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT IN OPEN COURT, IN JAIL. APD T. HOGAN AND ASA L. SWEET WERE PRESENT VIA ZOOM VIDEO. DEFENSE WAIVED SPEEDY TRIAL. DEFENSE MADE A MOTION TO CONTINUE. MOTION GRANTED. CASE SET FOR DOCKET CALL ON 01/05/2021 AT 9:00 AM. AP/DC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: HAUGEN, SHANNON ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketMENTAL HEALTH COURT SET FOR 10/05/2020 AT 2:30 PM IN 1D/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: MIRMAN, LAWRENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT JAIL SET FOR 09/30/2020 AT 9:30 AM IN 2C/ , COUNTY JUDGE: NELSON, KATHRYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE NELSON, KATHRYN: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/21/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020MM001825 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SCHWAB, CHARLES A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/18/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002230 A

    Read MoreRead Less