This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 05/22/2020 at 05:21:53 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. SHAW, LORI ANN

Case Summary

On 10/28/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SHAW, LORI ANN. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHWAB, CHARLES A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********95 A

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHWAB, CHARLES A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SHAW, LORI ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEDGES, SARA

Defendant Attorney

KELLY, REBECCA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

1/10/2020: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

1/9/2020: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

RETURN MAIL ( V )

12/3/2019: RETURN MAIL ( V )

NO INFORMATION ( V )

11/11/2019: NO INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

10/31/2019: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

10/30/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - INSUFFICIENT INFORMATION ( V )

10/29/2019: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - INSUFFICIENT INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

10/29/2019: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

10/28/2019: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

10/28/2019: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE

10/28/2019: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketAttorney PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN MAIL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 2; Description: USE OR POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA (893.147.1); Level: M; Degree: F; Disposition: Dropped / Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketREMOVED PUBLIC DEFENDER FEE PER F.S. 939.06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: HEDGES, SARA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 1; Description: POSSESSION OF 3,4- METHYLENEDIOXYPYROVALERONE(MDPV) (893.13.6A); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: Dropped / Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: KELLY, REBECCA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - INSUFFICIENT INFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SCHWAB, CHARLES A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 10/28/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CF002895 A

    Read MoreRead Less