This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 04/20/2023 at 12:01:28 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. SEELEY, ANDREW TYLER

Case Summary

On 01/20/2023 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SEELEY, ANDREW TYLER. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NELSON, KATHRYN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********37 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NELSON, KATHRYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SEELEY, ANDREW TYLER

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF PROBATION - RECORDED (OTHER.4967.1774. / 5171889)

3/28/2023: ORDER OF PROBATION - RECORDED (OTHER.4967.1774. / 5171889)

ORDER OF PROBATION

3/27/2023: ORDER OF PROBATION

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

3/10/2023: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

3/10/2023: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

PLEA AGREEMENT

3/7/2023: PLEA AGREEMENT

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

3/7/2023: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

3/1/2023: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

2/27/2023: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

1/24/2023: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

1/24/2023: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

DEMAND FOR COPY OF INFORMATION

1/24/2023: DEMAND FOR COPY OF INFORMATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

1/24/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

1/20/2023: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

TRANSFER CASE LETTER

1/20/2023: TRANSFER CASE LETTER

INFORMATION

1/19/2023: INFORMATION

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

1/10/2023: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

DEMAND FOR COPY OF INFORMATION

1/10/2023: DEMAND FOR COPY OF INFORMATION

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

1/10/2023: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketAttorney DOUGLAS TOUGAS - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketAttorney BARBARA KIBBEY - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF PROBATION - RECORDED (OTHER.4967.1774. / 5171889)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF PROBATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: DIAZ, CHRISTOPHER - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2023MM000137 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. SEELEY, ANDREW TYLER - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 2 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: CDB-3/10/2023"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketSURETY BOND U521486283 (893.147.1-3) RELEASED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketSURETY BOND U521486282 (893.13.6B) RELEASED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: TOUGAS, DOUGLAS ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR COPY OF INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE MIRMAN, LAWRENCE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/03/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023CF000021 A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less