This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/24/2020 at 12:38:38 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. SEAVOY, DANIEL RYAN

Case Summary

On 12/11/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SEAVOY, DANIEL RYAN. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LEVIN, STEVEN J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********02 A

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LEVIN, STEVEN J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SEAVOY, DANIEL RYAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LINN, MICHAEL JAMES

Defendant Attorney

COUZENS, STEVEN EDWARD

 

Court Documents

CERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4223.1625 / 4520910) ( V )

1/17/2019: CERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4223.1625 / 4520910) ( V )

UNIFORM COMMITMENT TO DOC ( V )

11/13/2018: UNIFORM COMMITMENT TO DOC ( V )

IN-COURT NOTES

10/30/2018: IN-COURT NOTES

SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET ( V )

10/30/2018: SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

8/23/2018: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

IN-COURT NOTES

8/21/2018: IN-COURT NOTES

IN-COURT NOTES

6/19/2018: IN-COURT NOTES

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

1/12/2018: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

IN-COURT NOTES

1/10/2018: IN-COURT NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

1/9/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

1/3/2018: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

1/3/2018: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

INFORMATION ( V )

1/2/2018: INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

12/12/2017: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

12/11/2017: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED

12/11/2017: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

12/11/2017: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

FIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT ( V )

12/9/2017: FIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT ( V )

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4223.1625 / 4520910) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4202.2336 / 4501153) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM COMMITMENT TO DOC ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4201.2347 / 4500233) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • HearingEvent: SENTENCING HEARING; Judge: LEVIN, STEVEN J; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC; Result: SENTENCE IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 2; Description: THIRD DEGREE GRAND THEFT (812.014.2C1); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: ADJUDICATED GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 1; Description: BURGLARY OF STRUCTURE (810.02.0); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: ADJUDICATED GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketIN-COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE LEVIN, STEVEN J: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/11/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017CF003302 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2017
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less