This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/09/2021 at 13:19:02 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. SCARINGE, MICHAEL EDWARD

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SCARINGE, MICHAEL EDWARD. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHWAB, CHARLES A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********55 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHWAB, CHARLES A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SCARINGE, MICHAEL EDWARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SWEET, LAUREN KATHERYN

Defendant Attorney

MOSHER, EDWARD JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

1/7/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

12/3/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

ORDER TO CONTINUE ( V )

12/3/2020: ORDER TO CONTINUE ( V )

MOTION TO CONTINUE FILED ( V )

12/2/2020: MOTION TO CONTINUE FILED ( V )

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

10/26/2020: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

10/15/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

10/15/2020: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT ARRAIGNMENT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

10/15/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT ARRAIGNMENT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

BONDSMAN OFF BOND FILED ( V )

10/7/2020: BONDSMAN OFF BOND FILED ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

10/7/2020: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

10/7/2020: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

10/6/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

INFORMATION ( V )

10/2/2020: INFORMATION ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

9/21/2020: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

9/21/2020: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

9/21/2020: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY; Judge: SCHWAB, CHARLES A; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: MOSHER, EDWARD JOSEPH - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CF002255 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. SCARINGE, MICHAEL EDWARD - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-1/7/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketDOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY SET FOR 03/03/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 3A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: SCHWAB, CHARLES A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY; Judge: SCHWAB, CHARLES A; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC; Result: CASE CONTINUED BY DEFENSE MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketSPEEDY TRIAL WAIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES: DOCKET CALL: DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT IN OPEN COURT, IN JAIL. ATTY E. MOSHER AND ASA L. SWEET WERE PRESENT VIA ZOOM VIDEO. DEFENSE WAIVED SPEEDY TRIAL. DEFENSE MADE A MOTION TO CONTINUE. MOTION GRANTED. CASE SET FOR DOCKET CALL ON 03/03/2021 AT 9:00 AM. AP/DC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY; Judge: SCHWAB, CHARLES A; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: MOSHER, EDWARD JOSEPH - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CF002255 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. SCARINGE, MICHAEL EDWARD - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-12/3/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT HEARING SET FOR 11/09/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN 3A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: SCHWAB, CHARLES A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: SWEET, LAUREN KATHERYN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND AS1K523087 POSTED $750.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND AS3K439018 POSTED $3,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SCHWAB, CHARLES A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/21/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002255 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SWEET, LAUREN KATHERYN