Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 04/16/2021 at 02:30:28 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. SAPIENZA, ERIC RANDALL

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SAPIENZA, ERIC RANDALL. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NELSON, KATHRYN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********65 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    St. Lucie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NELSON, KATHRYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SAPIENZA, ERIC RANDALL

 

Court Documents

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

4/9/2021: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/NO CONTACT ( V )

4/12/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/NO CONTACT ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT JAIL; Judge: NELSON, KATHRYN; Location: Courtroom 2C - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/NO CONTACT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT JAIL SET FOR 04/21/2021 AT 9:30 AM IN 2C/ , COUNTY JUDGE: NELSON, KATHRYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE NELSON, KATHRYN: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 04/09/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021MM000665 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant